Global Patent Index - EP 0951370 B1

EP 0951370 B1 2001-02-07 - FACILITY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING CAST SHELLS OR CAST CORE PACKS

Title (en)

FACILITY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING CAST SHELLS OR CAST CORE PACKS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG GIESSFERTIGER MASKEN ODER KERNPAKETE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE MASQUES DE COULEE OU DE PAQUETS DE NOYAUX DE COULEE

Publication

EP 0951370 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97942765 A

Priority

  • DE 9701911 W
  • DE 19645448 A
  • DE 19725379 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9819810A1] The present invention relates to a facility for producing cast shells or cast core packs, comprising a number a core shooters corresponding to the number of the various cores needed to complete one pack, as well as a belt conveyor (2), whereby the cores shot and hardened in the core shooters are removed therefrom and possibly processed and fed through the belt conveyor for completing the core packs. In order to increase the production capacity at a low cost, the inventive facility is designed in such a way that at least an additional core shooter - stand-by machine (5) - is provided for producing each of the cores needed for completing a pack. The invention also relates to the producing method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22C 15/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22C 15/24 (2006.01); B22C 19/00 (2006.01); B22C 23/00 (2006.01); B65D 19/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22C 23/00 (2013.01); B22C 15/24 (2013.01); B22C 19/00 (2013.01); B65D 19/44 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9819810 A1 19980514; CA 2270612 A1 19980514; EP 0951370 A1 19991027; EP 0951370 B1 20010207; ES 2155701 T3 20010516; US 6422296 B1 20020723

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090902

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110706

2011-07-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110718

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080925

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080923

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-04-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-09-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-07-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-05-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-05-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-08-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030821

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-09-20 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020920

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020916

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010427

2001-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155701 T3

2001-03-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702991 20010315

2001-02-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

2001-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-04-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000302

1999-10-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990520

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI