Global patent index - EP 0951952 A3

EP 0951952 A3 2000-02-02 - Suction device for a double point coating installation

Title (en)

Suction device for a double point coating installation

Title (de)

Absaugvorrichtung für eine Doppelpunkt-Beschichtungsanlage

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'aspiration pour une installation de revêtement à point double

Publication

EP 0951952 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99106991 A

Priority

  • CH 91398 A
  • CH 165798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0951952A2] The suction device removes excess powder (3') from a double-coated web (1). The device includes a powder suction element (4), a web suction unit to direct the web and at least one shaking roll (8, 9) to shake off the excess powder. There is at least one rotatable suction roll (5-7) to take the web through the plant itself under little or no traction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 5/04; B08B 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/04 (2006.01); B08B 5/04 (2006.01); B08B 7/02 (2006.01); D06B 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06B 15/04 (2013.01); B05B 15/0412 (2013.01); B08B 5/046 (2013.01); B08B 7/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0951952 A2 19991027; EP 0951952 A3 20000202; CH 693870 A5 20040331; US 6261366 B1 20010717

INPADOC legal status

2003-03-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020905

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020424

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE IT LI NL

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000306

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI NL

1999-10-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI