Global Patent Index - EP 0952290 A3

EP 0952290 A3 2002-12-18 - Fitting for swingable mounting of an upwardly openable panel to a cabinet body

Title (en)

Fitting for swingable mounting of an upwardly openable panel to a cabinet body

Title (de)

Beschlag zum schwenkbaren Befestigen einer nach oben zu öffnenden Klappe am Korpus eines Schrankes

Title (fr)

Ferrure pour le montage pivotable d'un volet à un corps d'armoire

Publication

EP 0952290 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99104250 A

Priority

DE 19817711 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0952290A2] A spring bearing device (29) on the installation part (6) is arranged so that it can be moved in its position, and this in a linear direction (35). The at least one spring bearing device is in threaded engagement with an adjustment spindle (36) on the installation part, on the articulated lever device or on the holding part, and is unrotatably arranged. The adjustment spindle is rotatable by an appropriate rotary tool. The at least one spring bearing device has a bearing bolt (37) for suspension of a screw spring (28).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 3/06; E05F 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 3/06 (2006.01); E05F 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 3/16 (2013.01); E05F 1/1276 (2013.01); E05D 2003/163 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/22 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/604 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/624 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/686 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/10 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0952290 A2 19991027; EP 0952290 A3 20021218

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-10-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI