Global patent index - EP 0955110 A3

EP 0955110 A3 2000-05-24 - Method and device for flow-turning

Title (en)

Method and device for flow-turning

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Drückwalzen und Drückwalzvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour le fluotournage

Publication

EP 0955110 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99101494 A

Priority

  • DE 19820470 A
  • DE 19830816 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6227024B1] A flow-forming device includes a forming device having a cage in which a plurality of rolling members are rotatably arranged in ring-like manner about a rotation axis. A spinning chuck is configured to hold a blank so as to be axially displaceable relative to the forming device. A drive is provided for rotating the blank relative to said forming device. A method for flow-forming includes rotating at least one of the blank and the rolling member about a rotation axis and flow-forming the blank through contact with a plurality of rolling members which are arranged in a ring-like manner around the rotation axis and mounted in rotary manner in a cage.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21H 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 53/28 (2006.01); B21H 5/02 (2006.01); B21J 5/12 (2006.01); B21K 1/30 (2006.01); B21H 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21H 5/025 (2013.01); B21H 5/02 (2013.01); B21J 5/12 (2013.01); B21H 7/187 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6227024 B1 20010508; CA 2271115 A1 19991107; EP 0955110 A2 19991110; EP 0955110 A3 20000524; EP 0955110 B1 20040407; JP 2000202556 A 20000725; JP 3202204 B2 20010827

INPADOC legal status

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59909081

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59909081

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130129

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LEIFELD METAL SPINNING AG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59909081

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120514

2012-07-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59909081

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: WEBER & HEIM PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120514

2012-05-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59909081

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: WEBER & HEIM PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2005-03-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050110

2005-03-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-10-06 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-05-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59909081

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-13

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-04-07 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-04-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-04-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040407

2003-11-26 [D18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D18D

2003-09-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030315

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020610

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000825

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 21H 5/02 A

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-11-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI