Global Patent Index - EP 0959227 A3

EP 0959227 A3 2000-08-30 - Piston and method of manufacture

Title (en)

Piston and method of manufacture

Title (de)

Kolben und Verfahren zur Herstellung

Title (fr)

Piston et procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 0959227 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99109847 A

Priority

  • JP 13853998 A
  • JP 34841998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0959227A2] A method for manufacturing improved pistons (22), which are reciprocated by a swash plate (20) in an compressor. Each piston (22) includes a head (40) and a skirt (42). The head (40) has a cylinder (41) with an open end, and the skirt (42) has a lid (43) for closing the open end of the cylinder (41). The lid (43) is friction welded to the cylinder (41). This method firmly joins the lid (43) to the cylinder (41) and reduces the cost and the time for manufacturing. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01B 3/00; F04B 27/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/08 (2006.01); B23K 20/12 (2006.01); F01B 3/00 (2006.01); F04B 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/0878 (2013.01); F01B 3/0085 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0959227 A2 19991124; EP 0959227 A3 20000830; BR 9901990 A 20000314; CN 1108470 C 20030514; CN 1245264 A 20000223; JP 2000038987 A 20000208; KR 100300511 B1 20010922; KR 20000011266 A 20000225

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040420

2003-01-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021129

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 01B 3/00 A, 7F 04B 27/08 B

2000-01-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KATO, TAKAYUKI, C/O TOYODA JIDOSHOKKI SEISAKUSHO

2000-01-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SUGIOKA, TAKAHIRO, C/O TOYODA JIDOSHOKKI SEISAKUS

2000-01-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TAKAMATSU, MASATO, C/O TOYODA JIDOSHOKKI SEISAKUS

2000-01-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SEKIGUCHI, TSUNEHISA

2000-01-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ANDO, MASAKI

1999-11-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990519

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1999-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI