Global Patent Index - EP 0967027 A3

EP 0967027 A3 2000-07-05 - Method for straightening steel sections while at the same time minimising the internal stress

Title (en)

Method for straightening steel sections while at the same time minimising the internal stress

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Richten von Profilstahl bei gleichzeitiger Minimierung der Eigenspannungen

Title (fr)

Méthode de redressement de profilés métalliques en minimisant les tensions internes en même temps

Publication

EP 0967027 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99111381 A

Priority

DE 19828784 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0967027A2] A steel profile with maximum and minimum local cross sectional temperatures is clamped and cooled down. As a consequence of clamping, the lower limit temperature produces a thermal dilatation in all profile fibers which is greater than the dilatation which would be required for fiber plasticizing of the non clamped profile with the highest compressive residual stresses. A steel profile (1) with maximum and minimum local cross-sectional temperatures respectively below the Ar1 point and above a lower limit temperature u is clamped at its ends (1a, 1b) and is cooled down. As a consequence of clamping, the lower limit temperature u produces a thermal dilatation in all profile fibers which is greater than the dilatation which would be required for fiber plasticizing of the non clamped profile with the highest compressive residual stresses.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/088 (2006.01); B21B 1/08 (2006.01); B21B 1/095 (2006.01); B21B 45/02 (2006.01); B21D 3/00 (2006.01); C21D 1/00 (2006.01); C21D 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/00 (2013.01); B21D 3/00 (2013.01); C21D 9/0068 (2013.01); C21D 9/0075 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0362122 A1 19900404 - MANNESMANN AG [DE]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 11 30 September 1998 (1998-09-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0967027 A2 19991229; EP 0967027 A3 20000705; EP 0967027 B1 20021002; AT 225217 T 20021015; BR 9902254 A 20000125; DE 19828784 A1 19991230; ES 2186279 T3 20030501; JP 2000033423 A 20000202; KR 20000006497 A 20000125; TW 434055 B 20010516; US 6315845 B1 20011113

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150611

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150611

2016-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150611

2016-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 225217

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20150611

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150611

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59902905

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-08-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SMS GROUP GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59902905

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-08-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59902905

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HEMMERICH & KOLLEGEN, DE

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140630

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140611

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140627

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140619

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2186279

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-02-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-01-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030102

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59902905

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-11-07

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT SE

2002-10-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 225217

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011210

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES GB IT SE

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990714

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT SE

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI