Global patent index - EP 0967682 A3

EP 0967682 A3 2000-08-16 - Leaky cable feeding system

Title (en)

Leaky cable feeding system

Title (de)

Speisesystem für ein strahlendes Kabel

Title (fr)

Système d'alimentation pour un câble rayonnant

Publication

EP 0967682 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99304288 A

Priority

JP 16188098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0967682A2] The present invention provides a communication system for transacting information with moving bodies by using a leaky cable (1) as an aerial cable. In this communication system, communication units (2) are provided at both ends of the leaky cable (1) for feeding power from both ends of the leaky cable so that a communication disabled area (21) never occurs and the reliability as a communication system is very high. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 13/20; H04B 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 5/00 (2006.01); H01Q 13/20 (2006.01); H04B 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 13/203 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0613259 A1 19940831 - SEL ALCATEL AG [DE]
  • [A] DE 2500941 A1 19750724 - INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP
  • [A] LEINWEBER J: "NBS-TUNNELFUNK FUER KUNDENDIENSTE. ÖTECHNISCHE ALTERNATIVEN UND SYSTEMBESCHREIBUNG", SIGNAL + DRAHT,DE,TELZLAFF VERLAG GMBH. DARMSTADT, vol. 82, no. 6, 1 June 1990 (1990-06-01), pages 117 - 123, XP000248955, ISSN: 0037-4997

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0967682 A2 19991229; EP 0967682 A3 20000816; JP H11355184 A 19991224

INPADOC legal status

2005-09-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050225

2004-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041014

2003-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIRECTOR GENERAL OF NATIONAL INSTITUTE FOR LAND AN

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001215

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01Q 13/20 A, 7H 04B 5/00 B

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI