Global Patent Index - EP 0968436 A2

EP 0968436 A2 2000-01-05 - INTEGRATED CIRCUIT AND METHOD FOR TESTING THE SAME

Title (en)

INTEGRATED CIRCUIT AND METHOD FOR TESTING THE SAME

Title (de)

INTEGRIERTE SCHALTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM TESTEN DER INTEGRIERTEN SCHALTUNG

Title (fr)

CIRCUIT INTEGRE ET PROCEDE POUR ESSAYER LEDIT CIRCUIT INTEGRE

Publication

EP 0968436 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98916822 A

Priority

  • DE 9800608 W
  • DE 19711478 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19711478A1] The invention relates to an integrated circuit with a CPU and a user ROM characterized by a test ROM whose address range is located inside the user ROM address range, a RAM located outside the CPU and switching means enabling access to either the user ROM or the test ROM and which can be irreversibly placed in a state allowing access to the user ROM only.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01R 31/317

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 11/22 (2006.01); G06F 12/14 (2006.01); G06F 21/24 (2006.01); G06K 19/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 11/22 (2013.01); G06K 19/07 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9841880A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19711478 A1 19981001; BR 9808381 A 20000523; CN 1251183 A 20000419; EP 0968436 A2 20000105; JP 2001527669 A 20011225; KR 20000076351 A 20001226; WO 9841880 A2 19980924; WO 9841880 A3 19990114

INPADOC legal status


2001-05-16 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010322

2001-01-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06F 11/22 A

2001-01-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: INTEGRATED CIRCUIT WITH TEST-ROM

2000-11-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06F 11/22 A

2000-11-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: INTEGRATED CIRCUIT WITH TEST-ROM

2000-11-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG

2000-06-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000508

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990903

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI