Global Patent Index - EP 0970284 A1

EP 0970284 A1 2000-01-12 - FRAME SECTION TO BE USED AS A MODULAR STRUCTURAL ELEMENT FOR BUILDINGS, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (en)

FRAME SECTION TO BE USED AS A MODULAR STRUCTURAL ELEMENT FOR BUILDINGS, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (de)

RAHMENTEIL ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS MODULARES BAUELEMENT FÜR GEBÄUDE, SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DERARTIGEN RAHMENTEILS

Title (fr)

CADRE DESTINE A ETRE UTILISE COMME ELEMENT DE CONSTRUCTION MODULAIRE POUR DES BATIMENTS ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN TEL CADRE

Publication

EP 0970284 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98924019 A

Priority

  • DE 9800795 W
  • DE 19712347 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19712347A1] The invention relates to a prefabricated frame section (hereafter referred to as a post) made of wooden beams or natural stone strips, specially a wall element, which can be used as a modular structural element for buildings or similar constructions. The posts (wooden beams or natural stone strips) comprise rough-sawn, relatively strain resistant members which are connected to each other in such a way that the frame section has precise, predefined external dimensions (length and width).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 2/38; E04B 1/343; E04B 1/61

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/56 (2006.01); E04B 1/10 (2006.01); E04B 1/61 (2006.01); E04C 2/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/6158 (2013.01); E04B 1/10 (2013.01); E04C 2/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9842932A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19712347 A1 19981001; AT 204049 T 20010815; AU 7637498 A 19981020; BG 103767 A 20000229; CA 2284701 A1 19981001; CN 1297505 A 20010530; CZ 295821 B6 20051116; CZ 9903378 A3 20000614; DE 19880364 D2 20000316; DK 0970284 T3 20011217; EA 001288 B1 20001225; EA 199900841 A1 20000424; EE 9900427 A 20000417; EP 0970284 A1 20000112; EP 0970284 B1 20010808; ES 2163866 T3 20020201; HU 0002776 A2 20001228; HU 0002776 A3 20020128; JP 2001518158 A 20011009; KR 20010005576 A 20010115; NO 994483 A 19991014; NO 994483 D0 19990916; PL 335778 A1 20000522; PT 970284 E 20020228; SK 129399 A3 20000612; TR 199902314 T2 20000121; US 6519907 B1 20030218; WO 9842932 A1 19981001; YU 47299 A 20001030

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-01-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59801173

- Effective date: 20121002

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110329

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2008-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020318

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080229

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070318

2006-03-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-04-22 [REG FR ERR] CORRECTION

- Free text: BOPI DE PUBLICATION Nø: 02/01 PAGES: 290 PARTIE DU BULLETIN CONCERNEE: BREVETS EUROPEENS DONT LA TRADUCTION N'A PAS ETE REMISE A I'INPI IL Y A LIEU DE SUPPRIMER: LA MENTION DE LA NON REMISE. LA REMISE DE LA TRADUCTION EST PUBLIEE DANS LE PRESENT BOPI.

2005-04-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050318

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030410

2003-12-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-03-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030318

2002-12-02 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2002-12-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-11-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020318

2002-10-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-10-07 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021007

2002-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HDB WEISSINGER G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-07-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-16 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20020716

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020402

2002-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-03-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-03-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020318

2002-03-18 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020318

2002-03-18 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020318

2002-02-28 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20010402038

2002-02-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20011108

2002-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2163866 T3

2002-01-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2001-09-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801173 20010913

2001-09-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-08-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19991025;LT PAYMENT 19991025;LV PAYMENT 19991025;MK PAYMENT 19991025;RO PAYMENT 19991025;SI PAYMENT 19991025

2001-08-08 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

2001-08-08 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-08-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 204049 T 20010815

2000-03-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000211

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991025

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19991025;LT PAYMENT 19991025;LV PAYMENT 19991025;MK PAYMENT 19991025;RO PAYMENT 19991025;SI PAYMENT 19991025