Global patent index - EP 0971849 A1

EP 0971849 A1 2000-01-19 - FOOD PACKAGING AND METHOD FOR COOKING FOOD

Title (en)

FOOD PACKAGING AND METHOD FOR COOKING FOOD

Title (de)

LEBENSMITTELVERPACKUNG UND GARVERFAHREN FÜR LEBENSMITTEL

Title (fr)

EMBALLAGE ET PROCEDE DE CUISSON POUR ALIMENTS

Publication

EP 0971849 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98958769 A

Priority

  • CH 9800546 W
  • CH 290997 A
  • CH 62598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9932373A1] The invention relates to a packaging (1, 4) in which food (8) can be transported and/or sold, containing food which is heated for consumption and which is to be heated in the packaging (1, 4). Said packaging (1, 4) consists of a microwaveable material and the food (8) that it contains is preferably at least partially raw. There should be enough liquid contained in the packaging, including the water-content of the food (8), for the food to cook in a vapour atmosphere which forms upon heating in a microwave oven. The packaging is also provided with elements (5) for limiting and/or reducing the vapour pressure which builds up inside it during rapid heating in the microwave oven. Said elements comprise especially a valve (5) or a defined hole with a sticker, with a relatively high degree of flow resistance. According to the inventive cooking method, the at least partially raw food (8) is cooked in a container (1, 4) in a microwave oven. During heating, the water content of the food and the construction of the container create a vapour exchange situation with excess pressure. The container takes the form of a transportation/sales packaging (1, 4) of the aforementioned type.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 81/34; B65D 77/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/22 (2006.01); B65D 81/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/225 (2013.01); B65D 81/3453 (2013.01); B65D 81/3461 (2013.01); B65D 2205/00 (2013.01); B65D 2581/3427 (2013.01); B65D 2581/3433 (2013.01); B65D 2581/3455 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9932373 A1 19990701; AT 214024 T 20020315; AU 1479099 A 19990712; BR 9807693 A 20000321; DE 59803273 D1 20020411; EP 0971849 A1 20000119; EP 0971849 B1 20020306; ES 2173648 T3 20021016; JP 2001512405 A 20010821; PT 971849 E 20020830; US 6607764 B1 20030819

INPADOC legal status

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20151126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20151222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141216

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141216

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141224

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20141218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20141218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20141230

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: DR. JOACHIM LAUER C/O RENTSCH PARTNER AG;FRAUMUENSTERSTRASSE 9 POSTFACH 2441;8022 ZUERICH (CH)

2012-02-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59803273

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BEATE KOENIG, DE

2012-02-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59803273

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: KOENIG, BEATE, DIPL.-PHYS. DR.RER.NAT., DE

2010-12-01 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20100908

2010-07-28 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: CRYOVAC, INC.

- Effective date: 20021129

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: DR. JOACHIM LAUER PATENTANWALT;STAPFERSTRASSE 5, POSTFACH 2651;8033 ZUERICH (CH)

2008-07-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: CREATIVE NOW FOOD DREAM STEAM GMBH

- Effective date: 20080507

2008-05-23 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2008-05-07 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLICATION

- Owner name: CREATIVE NOW FOOD DREAM STEAM GMBH

2008-05-07 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CREATIVE NOW FOOD DREAM STEAM GMBH

2008-04-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: CREATIVE NEW FOOD DREAM STEAM GMBH

- Effective date: 20080118

2008-03-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2008-03-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2008-01-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

- Owner name: CREATIVE NEW FOOD DREAM STEAM GMBH

- Free Format Text: KELLER, KARL#CHILEWISE 11#8197 RAFZ (CH) -TRANSFER TO- CREATIVE NEW FOOD DREAM STEAM GMBH#POSTSTRASSE 6#6300 ZUG (CH)

2007-02-28 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2004-09-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES;SEARCHED & EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-09-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2004-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-05-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: CRYOVAC, INC.

2004-03-17 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: CRYOVAC, INC.

- Effective date: 20021129

2003-12-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031218

2003-07-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-04-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: CRYOVAC, INC.

2003-02-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CRYOVAC, INC.

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-12-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-23 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20021223

- Year of fee payment: 05

2002-12-18 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-02 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20021202

- Year of fee payment: 05

2002-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2173648

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-08-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020516

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: DR. JOACHIM LAUER, PATENTANWALT

2002-06-06 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020606

2002-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59803273

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20020411

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: HUG INTERLIZENZ AG

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020306

2002-03-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020306

2002-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 214024

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20020315

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001023

2000-03-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990227

2000-02-02 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE