Global Patent Index - EP 0974526 A2

EP 0974526 A2 2000-01-26 - Blocks of baglets made of thermoplastic material film and method for their manufacturing

Title (en)

Blocks of baglets made of thermoplastic material film and method for their manufacturing

Title (de)

Beutelpacken von Beuteln aus thermoplastischer Kunststoffolie und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung

Title (fr)

Blocs de sachets en film de matière thermoplastique et procédé pour leur fabrication

Publication

EP 0974526 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98122423 A

Priority

  • DE 29812819 U
  • DE 29812818 U

Abstract (en)

The bag pack uses a bag which is blocked at one edge strip and with a perforated tearing line below the blocking. There is a weld seam in the region opposite the edge strip to form the bag bottom. Each bag is folded round a fold line running in the longitudinal direction of the bag. In the folded-in position, it is blocked in the edge region (R). The tearing line (107) is in the form of sickle-shaped cuts (107a) extending to the long side of the bag, so that the folded bags (1) are separated at the outer side edges (103a, b) from the blocked edge strip.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Beutelpacken (P) von Beuteln (1) aus thermoplastischer Kunststoffolie (100), wobei die Beutel (1) im Bereich eines Randstreifens (R) zumindest bereichsweise zu dem Packen verblockt sind und mit einer unterhalb des Verblockungsbereiches ausgebildeten perforierten Abreißlinie (107) zum Abtrennen der Beutel (1) von dem verblockten Randstreifen (R) ausgestattet sind und in dem dem Randstreifen (R) gegenüberliegenden Bereich mittels einer Schweißnaht (101) ein Bodenbeutel gebildet ist, wobei jeder Beutel (1) eines Packens (P) um in Längserstreckung des Beutels verlaufende Faltkanten (120) zwecks Verringerung der Beutelbreite eingefaltet ist und in der Einfaltposition an dem Packen (P) im Randbereich verblockt ist und die in den Beutelpacken (P) eingestanzte Abreißlinie (107) der eingefalteten Beutel (1) in Gestalt sichelartiger Einschnitte (107a) ausgeführt ist und die sichelartigen Einschnitte (107a) bis an die Längsseiten des Beutelpackens (P) reichen und diese durchtrennen, so daß die gefalteten Beutel (1) an ihren außenliegenden seitlichen Rändern (103a,b) von dem verblockten Randstreifen (R) getrennt sind und zwischen den sichelförmigen Einschnitten (107a) Verbindungsstege (107b) ausgebildet sind, über die die Beutel (1) mit dem Randstreifen (R) verbunden sind, dergestalt, daß die Verbindungsstege (107b) beim Abziehen der Beutel (1) durchreißen und ein Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/00 (2006.01); B65D 83/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/0894 (2013.01); B65D 33/001 (2013.01); B65D 83/0847 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

US 6286680 B1 20010911; AT 246125 T 20030815; EP 0974526 A2 20000126; EP 0974526 A3 20000816; EP 0974526 B1 20030730; EP 0974532 A2 20000126; EP 0974532 A3 20000816

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2004-08-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-07-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040130

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031126

2003-11-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031110

2003-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809160 P 20030904

2003-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2003-07-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-07-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-07-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2001-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010817

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010125

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65D 33/00 A, 7B 65D 83/08 B

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI