Global Patent Index - EP 0976122 A1

EP 0976122 A1 2000-02-02 - MATRIX DISPLAY ADDRESSING DEVICE

Title (en)

MATRIX DISPLAY ADDRESSING DEVICE

Title (de)

MATRIXANZEIGEADRESSIERUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ADRESSAGE D'UN ECRAN MATRICIEL

Publication

EP 0976122 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 96942417 A

Priority

  • FR 9602013 W
  • FR 9515405 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9723861A1] A device for addressing a matrix display such as an LCD or plasma display. The addressing device comprises a storage stage (70, 198) for receiving, via a demultiplexing stage (220), a plurality of digital data sequences representing previously digitised video luminance signals, and outputting the video luminance signals to a multiplexing stage (230) designed to select a digital data sequence that corresponds to a given combination of subpixels from the plurality of digital data sequences previously stored in said storage stage (70, 198).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/20 (2006.01); G09G 3/36 (2006.01); G09G 3/28 (2013.01); G09G 5/393 (2006.01); G09G 5/399 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/2003 (2013.01); G09G 3/28 (2013.01); G09G 3/3607 (2013.01); G09G 5/393 (2013.01); G09G 5/399 (2013.01); G09G 2300/0452 (2013.01); G09G 2310/0205 (2013.01); G09G 2310/0297 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9723861A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9723861 A1 19970703; DE 69637857 D1 20090416; EP 0976122 A1 20000202; EP 0976122 B1 20090304; FR 2742910 A1 19970627; FR 2742910 B1 19980417; JP 2000502813 A 20000307; JP 4105228 B2 20080625; KR 100425248 B1 20040727; US 6252613 B1 20010626

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151218

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-09-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160831

2016-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151218

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69637857

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150105

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141215

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-02-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091207

2009-04-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69637857 P 20090416

2009-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-03-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070503

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980318

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB