Global Patent Index - EP 0976475 A1

EP 0976475 A1 2000-02-02 - Filling system for the Production of moulded parts from thixotropic metal billets in die-casting machines

Title (en)

Filling system for the Production of moulded parts from thixotropic metal billets in die-casting machines

Title (de)

Eingusssystem für die Herstellung von Formteilen aus thixotropen Metallbolzen in Druckgiessmaschinen

Title (fr)

Système d' orifice de coulée pour la fabrication de pièces moulées à partir d' un lingot métallique thixotrope dans des machines de coulée sous pression

Publication

EP 0976475 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810732 A

Priority

EP 98810732 A

Abstract (en)

Each material entry channel (20, 21, ...) has a circular or elliptic cross section with a substantially constant area over its entire length. Directly adjacent to the material entry cavity (19) there is a bend (25, 26, ...). Between the bend (25, 26, ...) and the respective inlet opening (35, ...) there is a straight tubular section. The center line of the bend has a constant radius and a tangent at one end parallel to the longitudinal axis (1) of the cylindrical cavity (12) of the casting chamber. Its tangent at the other end coincides with the center line of the respective straight tubular section.

Abstract (de)

Druckgiessmaschine zur Herstellung von Formteilen aus thixotropen Metallbolzen, enthaltend ein Eingusssystem (17), welches einen Giesskammerhohlraum (12) mit einer Formkavität verbindet. Das Eingusssystem (17) enthält eine unmittelbar an eine Durchgangsöffnung (14) des Giesskammerhohlraumes (10) angrenzende Eingusskavität (19) und wenigstens einen davon wegführenden Eingusskanal (20, 21, 22, 23). Jeder Eingusskanal (20, 21, 22, 23) weist eine konzentrische Mittellinie (m1, m2) und an seinem gegen die Formkavität gerichteten Ende eine Einleitöffnung (35, 36, 37, 38) auf. Jeder Eingusskanal (20, 21, 22, 23) stellt ein rohrförmiges Kanalstück mit kreisförmigem oder elliptischem Querschnitt dar, wobei die Querschnittfläche auf der ganzen Länge im wesentlichen konstant ist. Jeder Eingusskanal (20, 21, 22, 23) enthält anschliessend an die Eingusskavität (19) einen Krümmer (25, 26, 27, 28) und daran anschliessend ein gerades Kanalstück. Der Krümmer (25, 26, 27, 28) ist derart ausgebildet, dass dessen Mittellinie (m1, m2) einen konstanten Biegeradius (Rk1. Rk2) aufweist, eine Tangente an die bis zur Durchgangsöffnung (14) mit demselben Biegeradius (Rk1, Rk2) weitergezogene Mittellinie (m1, m2) an der Durchgangsöffnung (14) parallel zu einer Längsachse (1) des zylinderförmigen Giesskammerhohlraumes (12) verläuft und eine Tangente an die Mittellinie (m1, m2) am gegen die Einleitöffnung (35, 36, 37, 38) gerichteten Krümmer-Ende (73, 74) mit der Mittellinie (m1, m2) des geraden Kanalstückes zusammenfällt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 17/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/00 (2006.01); B22D 17/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/007 (2013.01); B22D 17/2272 (2013.01); Y10S 164/90 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976475 A1 20000202; AT 225689 T 20021015; AU 5035699 A 20000221; BR 9912554 A 20010502; CA 2338502 A1 20000210; DE 59903037 D1 20021114; EP 1100640 A1 20010523; EP 1100640 B1 20021009; ES 2181457 T3 20030216; PT 1100640 E 20030228; US 6382302 B1 20020507; WO 0006323 A1 20000210

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030805

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020606

2001-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCAN TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT AG

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000802

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI