Global patent index - EP 0977299 A2

EP 0977299 A2 2000-02-02 - Active high frequency control element

Title (en)

Active high frequency control element

Title (de)

Aktives Hochfrequenzsteuerelement

Title (fr)

Elément de commande actif à haute fréquence

Publication

EP 0977299 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99113897 A

Priority

DE 19833512 A

Abstract (en)

An active high frequency control element comprises a control layer of temperature controllable electrical conductivity coupled to a high frequency conductor. An active high frequency control element comprises a high frequency compatible substrate bearing a high frequency conductor structure coupled to a control layer having an electrical conductivity which is controlled by changing its temperature. Preferred Features: The control layer comprises a resistive or electromagnetic radiation heated material exhibiting a semiconducting/metallic phase transition, e.g. VO2, V2O3, NiS, NbO2, FeSi2, LaCoO3, La2NiO3, Ti2O3, Ti4O7, Ti5O9 or Fe3O4.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine aktives HF-Steuerelement, mit einem HF-tauglichen Substrat, sowie einer darauf angebrachten HF-Leitungsanordnung; einem auf dem Substrat befindlichen Steuerschicht, deren elektrische Leitfähigkeit durch Temperaturänderung steuerbar ist, wobei die Steuerschicht an mindestens einer Stelle mit der HF-Leitungsanordnung gekoppelt ist, Mittel zur Temperaturänderung der Steuerschicht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/10; H01P 3/08; H01P 5/04; H01P 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/822 (2006.01); H01L 27/04 (2006.01); H01P 1/10 (2006.01); H01P 3/08 (2006.01); H01P 5/04 (2006.01); H01P 7/08 (2006.01); H01P 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 7/088 (2013.01); H01P 1/10 (2013.01); H01P 3/08 (2013.01); H01P 5/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19833512 A1 20000127; EP 0977299 A2 20000202; EP 0977299 A3 20010725; JP 2000059101 A 20000225

INPADOC legal status

2002-12-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020128

2002-05-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-04-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-07-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI