Global Patent Index - EP 0978336 A1

EP 0978336 A1 2000-02-09 - Mould wall of a continuous casting plant

Title (en)

Mould wall of a continuous casting plant

Title (de)

Kokillenwand einer Stranggiessanlage

Title (fr)

Paroi de lingotière d'une installation de coulée continue

Publication

EP 0978336 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99114556 A

Priority

DE 19835111 A

Abstract (en)

The bolt head cross-section of at least one bolts (6, 7) is larger than the bolt throat cross-section. The mold inner plate (2) has a nut (14) tapering to the water chamber (1) for receiving the bolt head (7'') of the bolt (7). Mold wall of a continuous casting apparatus for casting steel rods comprises a water chamber (1) and a mold inner plate (2) joined to the water chamber by bolts (6, 7). The bolts (6, 7) each have bolt throat (6', 7') penetrating the water chamber (1), and a bolt head (6'', 7'') held in the mold inner plate. The bolt head cross-section of at least one bolts (6, 7) is larger than the bolt throat cross-section. The mold inner plate (2) has a nut (14) tapering to the water chamber (1) for receiving the bolt head (7'') of the bolt (7).

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft eine Kokillenwand einer Stranggießanlage zum Gießen eines Metallstrangs (5), insbesondere eines Stahlstrangs (5), in einer Gießrichtung (x), mit einem Wasserkasten (1) und einer mit dem Wasserkasten (1)über Bolzen (6, 7) verbundenen Kokilleninnenplatte (2), wobei die Bolzen (6, 7) je einen den Wasserkasten (1) durchdringenden Bolzenhals (6', 7') mit einem Bolzenhalsquerschnitt und einen in der Kokilleninnenplatte (2) gehaltenen Bolzenkopf (6'', 7'') mit einem Bolzenkopfquerschnitt aufweisen. Zur einfacheren Halterung der Bolzen (6, 7) in der Kokilleninnenplatte (2) wird erfindungsgemäß vorgeschlagen, daß der Bolzenkopfquerschnitt mindestens eines der Bolzen (6, 7) größer ist als der Bolzenhalsquerschnitt dieses Bolzens (7) und daß die Kokilleninnenplatte (2) eine sich zum Wasserkasten (1) hin verjüngende Nut (14) zur Aufnahme des Bolzenkopfs (7'') dieses Boltzens (7) aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/055 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/055 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978336 A1 20000209; CN 1243774 A 20000209; DE 19835111 A1 20000210

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-19 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20021220

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021031

2001-04-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990816

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI