Global patent index - EP 0978852 A1

EP 0978852 A1 2000-02-09 - Multilayer type chip inductor

Title (en)

Multilayer type chip inductor

Title (de)

Mehrschichtige Chip-Induktivität

Title (fr)

Inductance de puce multicouche

Publication

EP 0978852 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99114703 A

Priority

KR 19980031688 A

Abstract (en)

A multilayer type chip inductor includes a pair of outermost sheets having a terminal pattern, respectively, wherein the terminal patterns are, respectively, identical in shape, each terminal pattern including a via hole and being capable of providing various positions for the via hole for electrically connecting the terminal pattern to the various conductor patterns of the intermediate sheet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 27/28; H01F 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/00 (2006.01); H01F 17/00 (2006.01); H01F 27/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/2804 (2013.01); H01F 17/0006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [YA] US 5655287 A 19970812 - USHIRO TOMOAKI [JP]
  • [A] FR 2379229 A1 19780825 - EUROFARAD [FR]
  • [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 07 31 July 1997 (1997-07-31)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 311 (E - 1561) 14 June 1994 (1994-06-14)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 573 (E - 1624) 2 November 1994 (1994-11-02)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 599 (E - 1631) 15 November 1994 (1994-11-15)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 11 28 November 1997 (1997-11-28)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 311 (E - 1561) 14 June 1994 (1994-06-14)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978852 A1 20000209; KR 20000013039 A 20000306

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-22 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20021122

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000808

2000-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KANG, NAM KEE

2000-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PARK, IN SHIG

2000-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LIM, WOOK

2000-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: YOO, CHAN SEI

2000-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KIM, JONG DAE

2000-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KO, HYUN JONG

2000-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KIM, SANG CHEOL

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI