Global patent index - EP 0979354 A1

EP 0979354 A1 2000-02-16 - SIDE CANAL PUMP WITH A SIDE CANAL LOCATED IN THE SUCTION COVER IN ORDER TO AVOID IMPERFECT VORTEX STRUCTURES

Title (en)

SIDE CANAL PUMP WITH A SIDE CANAL LOCATED IN THE SUCTION COVER IN ORDER TO AVOID IMPERFECT VORTEX STRUCTURES

Title (de)

SEITENKANALPUMPE MIT SEITENKANAL IM ANSAUGDECKEL ZUR VERMEIDUNG VERLUSTBEHAFTETER WIRBELSTRUKTUREN

Title (fr)

POMPE REGENERATIVE PRESENTANT UN CANAL LATERAL DANS LE COUVERCLE D'ASPIRATION POUR EVITER DES STRUCTURES TOURBILLONNAIRES A PERTES IMPORTANTES

Publication

EP 0979354 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98958154 A

Priority

  • DE 9802819 W
  • DE 19757580 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19757580A1] The invention relates to a side canal pump with a suction cover (10). The pump is used in a motor vehicle to deliver fuel. The suction cover (10) has a side canal (11) which runs radially around a rotation point (14) located in the suction cover (10), a first opening (13) for a suction canal (27) of the side canal (11), and a side canal width (BSK) which remains constant and which is located in a partial area running in a circumferential direction. The side canal (11) has a side canal width (BSK), said width remaining constant in the upper side (8), when seen from a beginning (12) of the side canal (11) with a starting value of a first angle ( phi ) ranging from 0 DEG , preferably of about 5 DEG , and no greater than 20 DEG , with regard to a line (LB) through the rotational axis (14) and through a contact point (1) located at the beginning (12). This results in an improved hot gasoline behavior, an increased efficiency, and a high pressure relationship of the side canal pump. The suction cover is especially suited for a double-flow side canal pump.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 5/002 (2013.01); F04D 5/007 (2013.01); F05B 2250/503 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9934117A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19757580 A1 19990701; BR 9807727 A 20000215; CN 1196864 C 20050413; CN 1248313 A 20000322; EP 0979354 A1 20000216; EP 0979354 B1 20040721; JP 2001513166 A 20010828; JP 4190588 B2 20081203; RU 2205984 C2 20030610; US 6287093 B1 20010911; WO 9934117 A1 19990708

INPADOC legal status

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59811692

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080923

2009-07-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090529

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070926

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070925

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-07-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050422

2005-06-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-01-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-10-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041021

2004-08-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59811692

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-08-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-07-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040721

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030711

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000110

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE