Global Patent Index - EP 0979689 A3

EP 0979689 A3 2001-04-25 - Method and device for minimising the height of wire bundles in a coiling chamber

Title (en)

Method and device for minimising the height of wire bundles in a coiling chamber

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Minimieren der Bundhöhe von Draht in einer Bundbildekammer

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour minimiser la hauteur de bobines de fil dans un tambour de réformation de spires de fil

Publication

EP 0979689 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99115314 A

Priority

DE 19835962 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0979689A2] The bundle height minimizing process is applied to wire bundles in a bundle building chamber (2). Individual wire windings are fed onto a horizontal transporting section (6), and at the end, are brought into a roughly vertical falling motion, falling into the chamber. The wire windings are laid out of their fall line eccentrically to the axis of symmetry (x-x) of the bundle building chamber, with a variable angle offset between two successive windings.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 47/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/02 (2006.01); B21C 47/14 (2006.01); B21C 47/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/146 (2013.01); B21C 47/14 (2013.01); B21C 47/265 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979689 A2 20000216; EP 0979689 A3 20010425; EP 0979689 B1 20040428; AT 265283 T 20040515; DE 19835962 A1 20000217; JP 2000071011 A 20000307; US 6405958 B1 20020618

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050803

2006-04-25 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-08-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050804

2005-08-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-08-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-08-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-09-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040816

2004-08-10 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040810

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-08-09 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040809

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-08-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040805

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-07-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040730

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-06-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909299 P 20040603

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT SE

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-12-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR MINIMISING THE HEIGHT OF WIRE BUNDLES IN A COILING CHAMBER

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030425

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE GB IT SE

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990824

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT SE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI