Global patent index - EP 0984109 A2

EP 0984109 A2 2000-03-08 - Building block and method and apparatus for making same

Title (en)

Building block and method and apparatus for making same

Title (de)

Baustein sowie Verfahren und Vorrichtung zu dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Bloc de construction et procédé et appareil de fabrication

Publication

EP 0984109 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99116998 A

Priority

  • DE 19850692 A
  • DE 19840335 A

Abstract (en)

A building block is made by extruding clay through a die with variable apertures. The interior of the block has hollow spaces (13,14) running through the length of the block. Some of the ribs forming the spaces are broken up by periodically closing off the respective apertures of the die and some of the spaces have a large width to depth ratio at right angles to the expected thermal flow when built into a wall. Another variation is to perforate some of the ribs. The overall effect is to retain the strength and sound damping properties while reducing the thermal losses through the block. The wider spaces have a width to depth ratio of up to 5 to 1 depending on the thickness of the ribs.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Baustein mit einer Vielzahl von inneren Hohlräumen vorgeschlagen, die den Baustein durchsetzen und mit Stegen, welche die Hohlräume trennen. Erfindungsgemäß ist wenigstens ein Steg im Bausteininnern ein- oder mehrfach unterbrochen. Eine weitere erfindungsgemäße Lösung sieht einen Baustein zur Wärmedämmung vor, der eine Vielzahl von Hohlräumen aufweist, die parallel zur Bausteinauflagefläche einen Querschnitt besitzen, dessen Längsausdehnung im Verhältnis zur Breitenausdehnung größer 2:1 ist, wobei die Längsausdehnung quer zur Wärmeflußrichtung orientiert ist, und wobei in den Hohlräumen in Wärmeflußrichtung kurze die Hohlraumwandungen verbindende Stegabschnitte vorgesehen sind. Bei einem Verfahren zur Herstellung derartiger Bausteine mittels extrudieren durch ein Mundstück werden zur Erzeugung von unterschiedlichen Lochbildern während des Extrudierens Durchlaßquerschnitte druckseitig im Mundstück zeitweise verschlossen. Schließlich wird eine Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von solchen Bausteinen vorgeschlagen, bei welcher Zwischenräume zwischen den Kernen wenigstens über einen Teil der Länge der Kerne in Extrudierrichtung im Druckbereich des Mundstücks verschließbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 3/26 (2006.01); E04B 2/14 (2006.01); E04B 2/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 3/26 (2013.01); E04B 2/14 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0208 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0226 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0984109 A2 20000308; EP 0984109 A3 20010411

INPADOC legal status

2002-08-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011012

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 04B 2/14 A, 7B 28B 3/26 B

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI