Global Patent Index - EP 0985764 A2

EP 0985764 A2 2000-03-15 - Pressing arrangement

Title (en)

Pressing arrangement

Title (de)

Pressenanordnung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de pressage

Publication

EP 0985764 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99111760 A

Priority

DE 19840023 A

Abstract (en)

Combined fibrous felts (18, 20) pass through two gaps (S1, S2). Each is formed by two cylindrical, non-cambered press rollers (22, 24; 26, 28). Preferred features: At least one roller of each pair forming the gaps, is compensated against bending. Gaps pass at least two combined felts. A fibrous web (10) passes through the gaps, between felts. One gap (S1) is formed between a suction pressure roller (22) and a lower, bending-compensated roller (24). The later gap (S2) is formed by a saddle roller (26) and a lower compensated roller (28). Both compensating rollers are underneath. Gaps are parallel and at right angles to web advance. Pressing planes (through pairs of press roller axes) are mutually inclined at angle alpha , lower rollers being closer. Wrapped rollers of the pairs, have the same diameter. The second, following gap (S2) has an upper, compensating saddle roller, and a conventional cylindrical lower roller.

Abstract (de)

Eine Pressenanordnung 16 zur Behandlung einer Faserstoffbahn 10 wie insbesondere Papier- oder Kartonbahn umfaßt wenigstens zwei Preßspalte S1, S2, denen zumindest ein gemeinsamer Filz 18, 20 zugeordnet ist, der zusammen mit der Faserstoffbahn 10 durch die Preßspalte S1, S1 geführt ist. Jeder der von dem gemeinsamen Filz 18, 20 durchsetzten Preßspalte S1, S2 ist jeweils zwischen zwei nicht bombierten, zumindest im wesentlichen zylindrischen Preßwalzen 22, 24; 26, 28 gebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985764 A2 20000315; EP 0985764 A3 20010627; DE 19840023 A1 20000309

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040810

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031023

2002-03-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI SE

2002-03-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011227

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI