Global patent index - EP 0988010 A1

EP 0988010 A1 2000-03-29 - ANTIGLARE DEVICE

Title (en)

ANTIGLARE DEVICE

Title (de)

BLENSCHUTZVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ANTIEBLOUISSANT

Publication

EP 0988010 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98923968 A

Priority

  • CH 9800258 W
  • CH 148797 A
  • CH 148897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9857606A1] The invention relates to an active electrooptic filter device used in particular as an antiglare device for welders'shields, helmets or glasses. In accordance with known methods, the inventive device is fitted with a light protective filter having at least one active optical filter element (1), electronic elements (2) that control the active filter element(s), a light sensor (4) that cooperates with the electronic elements, and in addition to current supply (5-7), in particular a solar cell, for the electronic elements and the active filter element(s). The invention seeks to provide a device which is economical to produce and easy to use. To this end, the light protective filter (1) is arranged in a filter module (FE), and the electronic elements (2), the light sensor (4) and the current supply (5-7) are arranged in a separate control unit (SE). The filter module (FE) and the control unit (SE) can be separably connected, mechanically and electrically, to form one unit (F). To achieve this, they have mutually cooperating mechanical and electric connecting elements (8-13). The invention also seeks to guarantee the user physiologically unimpaired vision in his work, as far as this is possible, for all lines of sight through the filter element, thus guaranteeing compliance with basic safety requirements, such as improved spatial vision, and, as a result, unimpaired balance and recognition of approaching objects. To this end, the light protection filter (1) has at least one optically active or passive compensating element, for example an optical phase delay foil, or an electrooptic filter, which enhances in particular the homogeneity of its light transmission in accordance with the viewing angle. In addition, the visual field of the light protective filter (1) is adapted to natural visual sensation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 9/06; G02F 1/01; G02F 1/13

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/13 (2006.01); A61F 9/06 (2006.01); B23K 9/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 9/067 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9857606A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9857606 A1 19981223; AU 7634898 A 19990104; EP 0988010 A1 20000329; JP 2002511798 A 20020416; TW 390808 B 20000521; US 6270223 B1 20010807

INPADOC legal status

2004-05-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-07-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: ANTIGLARE DEVICE

2003-07-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: ANTIGLARE DEVICE

2003-02-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021219

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991110

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI SE