Global Patent Index - EP 0989265 A1

EP 0989265 A1 2000-03-29 - Simplified lock for a motor vehicle door

Title (en)

Simplified lock for a motor vehicle door

Title (de)

Vereinfachtes Schloss für eine Kraftfahrzeugtür

Title (fr)

Serrure simplifiée pour portière de vèhicule automobile

Publication

EP 0989265 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402239 A

Priority

FR 9811739 A

Abstract (en)

The two compartments lie on opposite sides of a common base (15) extending over the whole area of the lock case (B). A control lever (11), mounted on stub shaft passing through the base and rotating a catch, releasing the bolt, in the other compartment, is actuated by a peg fixed under a toothed wheel (22), as the wheel rotates. The wheel is driven, via a worm gear, by a geared motor (16) energized on the initial movement of a cable (C) which operates a micro-switch (60), the cable being connected to the exterior door handle. The interior door handle acts directly on the catch. A reversible second motor is mounted (53) so as to control a pivoted (42) locking lever (41) via a toothed peripheral rack (48). This lever is also controllable (43) by a drum (44) turned by a conventional key in an exterior lock-barrel, and (45) by an interior e.g. plunger-type manual handle. If the opening motor (16), or its supply, is defective, the door can be opened by continued movement of the exterior handle, via a cable end-stop (36), which transmits the effort to the control lever (11) through a pivoted (33) emergency lever (32); however, when the door is locked the locking lever (41) disengages the end-stop from the forked end of the emergency lever. The locking motor also responds to the usual external remote control.

Abstract (fr)

Serrure pour portière de véhicule automobile, comportant un pêne, un cliquet, un mécanisme d'ouverture extérieure (32) pour actionner le cliquet vers sa position de libération du pêne, un moyen mécanique de liaison extérieure (C) dont une portion extérieure est destinée à être reliée à un moyen de commande extérieure, et dont une portion intérieure s'étend à l'intérieur du boîtier de serrure (B) et est apte à actionner le mécanisme d'ouverture pour provoquer l'ouverture de la serrure, en réponse à l'actionnement du moyen de commande, et un levier de condamnation bi-stable (41) pour mettre la serrure dans une position condamnée ou décondamnée, caractérisée par le fait que le levier de condamnation est apte à modifier le trajet de la portion intérieure du moyen de liaison pour, dans la position de condamnation de la serrure, faire échapper ladite portion intérieure du moyen de liaison au mécanisme d'ouverture (32) et, dans la position de décondamnation de la serrure, mettre la portion intérieure dudit moyen de liaison dans une position de coopération avec le mécanisme d'ouverture. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 47/00; E05B 65/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/12 (2006.01); E05B 17/00 (2006.01); E05B 17/22 (2006.01); E05B 53/00 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 77/34 (2013.01); E05B 79/20 (2013.01); E05B 81/14 (2013.01); E05B 81/66 (2013.01); E05B 77/16 (2013.01); E05B 77/30 (2013.01); E05B 85/01 (2013.01); E05B 85/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989265 A1 20000329; EP 0989265 B1 20030502; DE 69907356 D1 20030605; DE 69907356 T2 20040401; FR 2783549 A1 20000324; FR 2783549 B1 20001229

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69907356

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140911

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-10-29 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-08-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-08-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030802

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69907356 P 20030605

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2003-05-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-05-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030502

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010723

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT SE

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000808

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI