Global Patent Index - EP 0991044 A2

EP 0991044 A2 2000-04-05 - Method for traffic monitoring by radar

Title (en)

Method for traffic monitoring by radar

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Verkehrsüberwachung mit Radar

Title (fr)

Méthode pour la surveillance de circulation commandés par radar

Publication

EP 0991044 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99115123 A

Priority

DE 19844803 A

Abstract (en)

The method uses telecommunications, for speed measurement and control and for automatically performing the resulting operations or functions. A miniaturized monitoring and measurement device (2), integrated into a road traffic sign (1), especially a speed restriction sign, detects vehicles (4) exceeding the speed limit using radar. The detected data and information are transmitted via a telecommunications medium to a device or control point (7) for evaluation. The control point has a database for vehicle holder identification and may be connected to a traffic offender index (9). It can also be connected via telecommunications paths or post to the home (11) for delivering documents. An Independent claim is also included for a circuit for implementing the method.

Abstract (de)

Die hier beschriebene automatische Radarverkehrsüberwachung und -steuerung mittels Telekommunikation ermöglicht eine flächendeckende Überwachung der Einhaltung der vorgeschriebenen Geschwindigkeiten im Straßenverkehr. Dadurch ist es möglich, flächendeckend Kontrollsysteme aufzubauen, in denen an/in jedem Verkehrsschild (1) eine miniaturisierte Einrichtung (2) aus mindestens einer Radar-Einrichtung, einer Kamera und einer Sendeeinrichtung implementiert ist. Die miniaturisierte Einrichtung bzw. Meßstelle (2) ist über eine entsprechende Einrichtung (6) adressierbar oder abrufbar ausgestattet und mit einer Leitstelle für Auswertung (7) verbindbar. Hier erfolgt eine automatische Datenauswertung, eine zufallsgesteuerte Freischaltung, ein Datenabruf, zum Beispiel auch eine Generierung eines Beleges, die Gebühreneinzugskontrolle und gegebenenfalls die automatische Mahnung. Die Leitstelle für Auswertung (7) ist mit einer Datenbank zur Kfz-Halter-Identifizierung (8) und gegebenenfalls mit einer Verkehrssünderkartei (9) verbunden. Über einen Telekommunikationsweg (10) ist die Leitstelle (7) außerdem direkt mit dem Heim (11) des jeweiligen Kfz-Halters verbindbar. Eine Variation dieses Systems besteht noch darin, daß die Radareinrichtung bzw. Funkeinrichtung mit ausreichendem zeitlichen Vorlauf, das heißt im genügend großen Reaktionsabstand, einen Warnimpuls über einen Radarempfänger im Fahrzeug auslöst. Reagiert der Fahrer nicht durch abbremsen, löst der Warnimpuls dann entweder einen Bremsmechanismus oder das entsprechende Erfassungsverfahren aus. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/0967; G08G 1/052

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/052 (2006.01); G08G 1/0967 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/096725 (2013.01); G08G 1/052 (2013.01); G08G 1/09675 (2013.01); G08G 1/096783 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0991044 A2 20000405; EP 0991044 A3 20000517; EP 0991044 B1 20041201; AT 284068 T 20041215; DE 19844803 A1 20000413

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170823

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170824

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170823

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050501

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: DEUTSCHE *TELEKOM A.G.

- Effective date: 20050831

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-10-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-10 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050810

2005-08-10 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050810

2005-07-27 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-03-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050309

2005-03-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050312

2005-03-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-03-01 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-03-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911176 P 20050105

2004-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-12-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-01 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-06-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR TRAFFIC MONITORING BY RADAR

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031205

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001117

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI