Global Patent Index - EP 0991088 A1

EP 0991088 A1 2000-04-05 - Multilayer type chip inductor

Title (en)

Multilayer type chip inductor

Title (de)

Mehrsichtichge Chip-Induktivität

Title (fr)

Inductance de puce multicouche

Publication

EP 0991088 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99119524 A

Priority

KR 19980041680 A

Abstract (en)

A multilayer type chip inductor having a pair of outermost sheets and a plurality of intermediate sheets stacked between the outermost sheets, includes a pair of shielding sheets each of which has a shielding pattern for preventing electromagnetic waves generated thereby from being emitted. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 17/00; H01F 27/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 17/00 (2006.01); H01F 27/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 17/0013 (2013.01); H01F 27/362 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0991088 A1 20000405; KR 20000024888 A 20000506

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030527

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030115

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KANG, NAM KEE

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PARK, IN SHIG

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LIM, WOOK

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YOO, CHAN SEI

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KIM, JONG DAE

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KO, HYUN JONG

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KIM, SANG CHEOL

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI