Global Patent Index - EP 0992080 A1

EP 0992080 A1 2000-04-12 - ANTENNA WITH HIGH SCANNING CAPACITY

Title (en)

ANTENNA WITH HIGH SCANNING CAPACITY

Title (de)

ANTENNE MIT HOHER STRAHLSCHWENKKAPAZITÄT

Title (fr)

ANTENNE A FORTE CAPACITE DE BALAYAGE

Publication

EP 0992080 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98933717 A

Priority

  • FR 9801345 W
  • FR 9708011 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2765404A1] The invention concerns an antenna with high scanning capacity, comprising a panel of static radiating elements (30) controlled to emit in variable directions relative to a direction (38) perpendicular to the panel plane. Reflectors (34, 44) amplify the scanning operated by the panel (30) of radiating elements. Said reflectors (34, 44) are for example paraboloid segments with a common axis (38) and a common focus (40).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 19/19; H01Q 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 19/19 (2006.01); H01Q 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 25/007 (2013.01); H01Q 19/192 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9900870A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2765404 A1 19981231; FR 2765404 B1 19990924; AU 8344098 A 19990119; CA 2289007 A1 19990107; CA 2289007 C 20050823; DE 69803671 D1 20020314; DE 69803671 T2 20020912; EP 0992080 A1 20000412; EP 0992080 B1 20020130; ES 2169919 T3 20020716; US 6172649 B1 20010109; WO 9900870 A1 19990107

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-01-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169919 T3

2002-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69803671 20020314

2002-02-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020130

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010426

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT