Global Patent Index - EP 0992659 A2

EP 0992659 A2 2000-04-12 - Exhaust pipe element and method for producing an exhaust pipe element

Title (en)

Exhaust pipe element and method for producing an exhaust pipe element

Title (de)

Abgasleitelement und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Abgasleitelements

Title (fr)

Elément de conduit d'échappement et procédé de préparation d'un élément de conduit d'échappement

Publication

EP 0992659 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99810887 A

Priority

CH 202098 A

Abstract (en)

The exhaust guide element has two or more feed pipes (15) connected to an IC engine (1). The element wall consists of two wall elements (23,24) each with two metallic shells (25,26) and an intermediate layer of heat insulating material. The wall elements have connected edge sections and together enclose interior spaces of all feed pipes. The heat insulating material is micro-porous, has a granulated structure, and is at least 3mm thick.

Abstract (de)

Das Abgasleitelement (11) weist einen Auspuffkrümmer (12) mit mindestens zwei Zuleitungen (15), beispielsweise noch einen Katalysator (13) und eine Wandung mit zwei Verbund-Wandelementen (23, 24) auf. Die zwei Wandelemente (23, 24) umschliessen zusammen im Querschnitt Innenräume aller Zuleitungen (15) und eventuell auch noch die Katalysatormittel (41) des Katalysators (13). Jedes Wandelement (23, 24) besitzt zwei einstückige, metallische Schalen (25, 26) und eine zwischen diesen angeordnete Schicht (35) wärmedämmendes Isoliermaterial, so dass jedes Wandelement (23, 24) eine gute Wärmedämmung ergibt. Bei der Herstellung eines Wandelements (23, 24) werden die zu diesem gehörenden Schalen (25, 26) und die dazwischen angeordnete Isoliermaterial-Schicht (35) gemeinsam plastisch verformt. Dies ermöglicht eine kostengünstige Herstellung der Wandung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 7/10; F01N 3/28; F01N 7/14; F01N 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/28 (2006.01); F01N 13/00 (2010.01); F01N 13/10 (2010.01); F01N 13/14 (2010.01); F01N 13/18 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/102 (2013.01); F01N 3/2853 (2013.01); F01N 3/2864 (2013.01); F01N 13/008 (2013.01); F01N 13/14 (2013.01); F01N 13/1844 (2013.01); F01N 13/185 (2013.01); F01N 13/1888 (2013.01); F01N 2310/02 (2013.01); F01N 2450/20 (2013.01); F01N 2450/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992659 A2 20000412; EP 0992659 A3 20031210; EP 0992659 B1 20070502; AR 020716 A1 20020522; BR 9904425 A 20000815; DE 59914322 D1 20070614; JP 2000110557 A 20000418; JP 4596581 B2 20101208; KR 20000028835 A 20000525; US 6555070 B1 20030429

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: BOSAL EMISSION CONTROL SYSTEMS NV, BE

- Effective date: 20150908

2015-05-13 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 59914322

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: F01N0007100000

- IPC: F01N0013100000

- Effective date: 20150408

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCAMBIA HOLDINGS CYPRUS LTD., CY

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SCAMBIA INDUSTRIAL DEVELOPMENTS AG, SCHAAN, LI

- Document: DE 59914322

- Effective date: 20150407

2015-05-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59914322

- Representative's name: HABBEL & HABBEL, DE

- Effective date: 20150407

2015-05-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59914322

- Representative's name: HABBEL UND HABBEL PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20150407

2015-04-08 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 59914322

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: F01N0007100000

- IPC: F01N0013100000

2015-04-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59914322

- Representative's name: HABBEL & HABBEL, DE

2015-04-01 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150305 AND 20150311

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070502

2008-04-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080205

2007-10-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-07-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070620

2007-06-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59914322 P 20070614

2007-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-05-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040827

2004-09-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040206

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI