Global Patent Index - EP 0994290 A1

EP 0994290 A1 2000-04-19 - Filling a container with gas under pressure

Title (en)

Filling a container with gas under pressure

Title (de)

Füllung eines Behälters mit Gas unter Druck

Title (fr)

Remplissage d'un récipient avec gaz sous pression

Publication

EP 0994290 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99308100 A

Priority

FR 9812956 A

Abstract (en)

When filling a tank with xenon or krypton gases for use as a propellant in satellites, it is necessary to proceed slowly to allow heat to dissipate. The invention deals with this problem by withdrawing gas from the tank, cooling it, and re-introducing the cooled gas into the tank. The circulation of gas from and back to the tank is preferably achieved by a thermosyphonic action. The gas is preferably liquefied when it is cooled to give a strong thermosyphonic action and may be evaporated again before being returned to the tank. In a variation of the invention, the temperature of the tank is prevented from falling below a critical minimum temperature during depressurization of the tank by recirculating and heating some of the fluid during depressurization. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F17C 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F17C 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F17C 5/06 (2013.01); F17C 2221/014 (2013.01); F17C 2221/016 (2013.01); F17C 2223/0153 (2013.01); F17C 2223/033 (2013.01); F17C 2225/0123 (2013.01); F17C 2225/036 (2013.01); F17C 2227/0302 (2013.01); F17C 2227/0337 (2013.01); F17C 2227/0393 (2013.01); F17C 2250/032 (2013.01); F17C 2250/036 (2013.01); F17C 2260/031 (2013.01); F17C 2265/065 (2013.01); F17C 2270/0197 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994290 A1 20000419; FR 2784737 A1 20000421

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-11-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020501

2001-01-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): FR

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001017

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI