Global Patent Index - EP 0995548 A1

EP 0995548 A1 2000-04-26 - Method and apparatus for grinding lenses

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for grinding lenses

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Schleifen von Linsen

Title (fr)

Procédé et machine de meulage de verres optiques

Publication

EP 0995548 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402580 A

Priority

  • FR 9813334 A
  • FR 9902919 A

Abstract (en)

The grinding method for optical lenses involves turning a lens blank (1) around a rotary axis (Y-Y) parallel to the axis (X-X) of a train of grinding wheels (5). The spacing between the axes is controlled as a function of the angular position of the blank. The temperature is sensed as a function of distance from the working area to adjust the spacing.

Abstract (fr)

Dans ce procédé, on fait tourner une ébauche de verre (1) autour d'un axe de rotation (Y-Y) parallèle à l'axe (X-X) d'un train de meules (5), et on règle la distance (d) entre les deux axes en fonction de la position angulaire de l'ébauche. Pour améliorer la précision du meulage, on mesure (en 22) une température influant sur ladite distance, et on corrige le réglage de cette distance en fonction de la température mesurée. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 9/14; B24B 49/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 9/14 (2006.01); B24B 49/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 9/14 (2013.01); B24B 49/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995548 A1 20000426; EP 0995548 B1 20020814; DE 69902507 D1 20020919; DE 69902507 T2 20030528; ES 2182467 T3 20030301; FR 2784922 A1 20000428; FR 2784922 B1 20010209; IL 132492 A 20030624; IL 132492 D0 20010319

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-07-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69902507

- Effective date: 20140501

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121011

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LUNEAU TECHNOLOGY OPERATIONS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BRIOT INTERNATIONAL, PONT DE L'ARCHE, FR

- Document: DE 69902507

- Effective date: 20120820

2012-10-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LUNEAU TECHNOLOGY OPERATIONS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BRIOT INTERNATIONAL, PONT DE L'ARCHE, EURE, FR

- Document: DE 69902507

- Effective date: 20120820

2012-10-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69902507

- Representative's name: WABLAT LANGE KARTHAUS ANWALTSSOZIETAET, DE

- Effective date: 20120820

2012-08-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69902507

- Representative's name: WABLAT LANGE KARTHAUS ANWALTSSOZIETAET, DE

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101020

2011-11-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111118

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091027

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-08-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030515

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182467 T3

2002-09-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69902507 20020919

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010912

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI