Global Patent Index - EP 0997039 A4

EP 0997039 A4 2000-05-03 - MULTI-FORMAT AUDIO/VIDEO PRODUCTION SYSTEM WITH FRAME-RATE CONVERSION

Title (en)

MULTI-FORMAT AUDIO/VIDEO PRODUCTION SYSTEM WITH FRAME-RATE CONVERSION

Title (de)

MULTIFORMAT-AUDIO-VIDEO-PRODUKTIONSSYSTEM MIT BILDFREQUENZUMWANDLUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE PRODUCTION AUDIO/VIDEO MULTIFORMAT AVEC CONVERSION DE LA FREQUENCE DE TRAMES

Publication

EP 0997039 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96904562 A

Priority

  • US 9601501 W
  • US 29810494 A
  • US 5086193 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9727704A1] A program input may be translated into any of various graphics or television formats, and stored as compressed images, using any of several commercially available methods. While being processed, the images (e.g. 180) may be re-sized (182, 184) to produce a desired aspect ratio or dimensions using conventional techniques, such as interpolation, and signals within the video data stream optionally may be used to control "pan-scan" operations at a receiving end, in case this end does not have the same aspect ratio as the source signal. Frame rate conversion to and from conventional formats is performed by using the techniques employed for well known film-to-NTSC and film-to-PAL transfers, or by inter-frame interpolation. By judicious selection of the optimal digitizing parameters, the system allows a user to establish an inter-related family of aspect ratios, resolutions, and frame rates, and yet remain compatible with currently available and planned formats.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 7/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/14 (2006.01); G06T 9/00 (2006.01); G11B 27/031 (2006.01); G11B 27/34 (2006.01); H04N 1/00 (2006.01); H04N 5/222 (2006.01); H04N 5/232 (2006.01); H04N 5/765 (2006.01); H04N 7/01 (2006.01); H04N 7/10 (2006.01); H04N 7/14 (2006.01); H04N 7/15 (2006.01); H04N 7/18 (2006.01); H04N 9/804 (2006.01); G11B 27/00 (2006.01); G11B 27/024 (2006.01); G11B 27/032 (2006.01); G11B 27/034 (2006.01); H04N 5/44 (2011.01); H04N 5/77 (2006.01); H04N 5/781 (2006.01); H04N 5/85 (2006.01); H04N 5/915 (2006.01); H04N 5/926 (2006.01); H04N 9/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 9/8042 (2013.01); G06F 3/14 (2013.01); G06T 9/007 (2013.01); G11B 27/031 (2013.01); G11B 27/34 (2013.01); H04N 1/00283 (2013.01); H04N 5/222 (2013.01); H04N 5/232 (2013.01); H04N 5/23203 (2013.01); H04N 5/765 (2013.01); H04N 7/0112 (2013.01); H04N 7/0125 (2013.01); H04N 7/10 (2013.01); H04N 7/142 (2013.01); H04N 7/147 (2013.01); H04N 7/15 (2013.01); H04N 7/181 (2013.01); G06F 3/1454 (2013.01); G09G 2340/02 (2013.01); G09G 2340/0407 (2013.01); G09G 2340/0442 (2013.01); G11B 27/002 (2013.01); G11B 27/024 (2013.01); G11B 27/032 (2013.01); G11B 27/034 (2013.01); G11B 2220/20 (2013.01); G11B 2220/2516 (2013.01); G11B 2220/2525 (2013.01); G11B 2220/41 (2013.01); G11B 2220/455 (2013.01); G11B 2220/61 (2013.01); G11B 2220/90 (2013.01); G11B 2220/913 (2013.01); H04N 5/4401 (2013.01); H04N 5/772 (2013.01); H04N 5/781 (2013.01); H04N 5/85 (2013.01); H04N 5/915 (2013.01); H04N 5/9261 (2013.01); H04N 7/0122 (2013.01); H04N 9/641 (2013.01); H04N 9/642 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] GB 2286500 A 19950816 - SONY UK LTD [GB]
  • [A] BANCROFT D J: "PIXELS AND HALIDE - A NATURAL PARTNERSHIP?", SMPTE JOURNAL, vol. 103, no. 5, 1 May 1994 (1994-05-01), pages 306 - 311, XP000451018, ISSN: 0036-1682
  • [A] PANTUSO C A: "REDUCING FINANCIAL ALIASING IN HDTV PRODUCTION", BETTER VIDEO IMAGES, INCL. 23RD ANNUAL SMPTE TELEVISION CONFERNCE, SAN FRANCISCO, CA, FEB. 3 - 4, 1989, pages 157 - 169, XP000088837
  • [A] JAMIN H: "ELECTRONIC FILM MASTER. ARCHIVIERUNG IM 625/50-STANDARD", FERNSEH UND KINOTECHNIK, vol. 49, no. 12, 1 December 1995 (1995-12-01), pages 746 - 748, XP000545312, ISSN: 0015-0142
  • See also references of WO 9727704A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9727704 A1 19970731; EP 0997039 A1 20000503; EP 0997039 A4 20000503; US RE38079 E 20030415

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-19 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1027703

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020815

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980729

2000-05-03 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991014

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL