Global Patent Index - EP 0997200 A1

EP 0997200 A1 2000-05-03 - Dispenser for fluids having a threaded bore air manifold

Title (en)

Dispenser for fluids having a threaded bore air manifold

Title (de)

Fluidaustragsvorrichtung mit einem Luftverteiler mit einer Gewindebohrung

Title (fr)

Appareil de décharge de fluides muni d'un distributeur d'air à alésage taraudé

Publication

EP 0997200 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98120344 A

Priority

EP 98120344 A

Abstract (en)

Dispensing apparatus (10) for dispensing heated thermoplastic material, such as hot melt adhesive, especially useful in intermittent dispensing operations. The apparatus includes a dispensing gun body adapted for connection to a supply of heated thermoplastic material and including a thermoplastic material discharge outlet and at least one air discharge passage for directing air at thermoplastic material exiting the thermoplastic material discharge outlet. An air manifold (30) having at least one air heating passage is provided with the air heating passage extending between an inlet and outlet thereof and the air inlet being adapted for connection to a source of pressurized air. The air outlet of the manifold communicates with the air discharge passage of the gun body. At least one heating element is thermally coupled to the air manifold for heating air passing from the air inlet to the air outlet of the air heating passage. The air heating passage of the manifold (30) includes turbulating structure, which advantageously takes the form of internal threads, for inducing turbulence in the air flowing through the air heating passage and thereby promoting efficient, uniform heating of the air during dispensing operation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 17/005; B05B 7/08; B05B 7/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/10 (2006.01); B05B 1/28 (2006.01); B05B 7/08 (2006.01); B05B 7/16 (2006.01); B05C 5/00 (2006.01); B05C 17/005 (2006.01); B05D 1/02 (2006.01); B05D 7/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/1613 (2013.01); B05B 7/0861 (2013.01); B05C 17/00523 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997200 A1 20000503; EP 0997200 B1 20040331; AU 5707199 A 20000504; AU 761181 B2 20030529; BR 9906120 A 20000912; CA 2284143 A1 20000428; DE 69822835 D1 20040506; DE 69822835 T2 20050210; JP 2000153185 A 20000606

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071028

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051017

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061028

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061028

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051017

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051014

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050831

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-12-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69822835 P 20040506

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-03-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DISPENSER FOR FLUIDS HAVING A THREADED BORE AIR MANIFOLD

2003-12-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CARSON KING D. JR.

2003-12-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: REIFENBERGER, MARK G.

2003-12-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HARBEN, WILLIAM A.

2001-11-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011009

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI