Global Patent Index - EP 1000206 A1

EP 1000206 A1 2000-05-17 - SELF-VENTILATING PROTECTIVE AND DECORATIVE COVERING system FOR WALLS AND ROOFS

Title (en)

SELF-VENTILATING PROTECTIVE AND DECORATIVE COVERING system FOR WALLS AND ROOFS

Title (de)

SELBSTVENTILIERENDE, SCHÜTZENDE UND DEKORATIVE VERKLEIDUNGSSYSTEM FÜR WÄNDE UND DÄCHER

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE REVETEMENT PROTECTEUR ET DECORATIF A AUTO-VENTILATION POUR DES MURS ET DES TOITS

Publication

EP 1000206 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98925932 A

Priority

  • IT 9800151 W
  • IT PD970123 A
  • IT PD970288 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9857009A1] A new insulating system which is constituted by new, wedge-shaped modular elements (tiles made of baked clay, ceramic, grès, majolica, cement, glass, solid or rolled metal, or other materials) that are monocolour or multicolour, have rectangular or pentagonal shape, are truncated at the top and similar to a drop (or other suitable shape). The shape of the modular elements with suitable inclinations and properly bevelled corners, makes it possible to create a protective covering characterized by considerable weight and stratified structure, said covering having also aesthetic-decorative functions, due to the geometrical shapes of the tiles and to the different colours used. The system comprises a horizontal frame properly fixed to a longitudinal frame, constituted by profiles made of wood and/or metal and/or other material and having shape and consistency suitable for the fastening of the tiles with screws or other accessoires for the creation of a chamber suitable for the ascent of the ventilation air produced by the stack effect.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 13/08; E04D 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/12 (2006.01); E04F 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/0864 (2013.01); E04D 1/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9857009A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9857009 A1 19981217; EP 1000206 A1 20000517

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040923

2004-06-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SELF-VENTILATING PROTECTIVE AND DECORATIVE COVERING SYSTEM FOR WALLS AND ROOFS

2004-06-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SELF-VENTILATING PROTECTIVE AND DECORATIVE COVERING SYSTEM FOR WALLS AND ROOFS

2004-05-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SELF-VENTILATING PROTECTIVE AND DECORATIVE COVERING SYSTEM FOR WALLS AND ROOFS

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020611

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000111

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE