Global Patent Index - EP 1002048 A2

EP 1002048 A2 2000-05-24 - AGENT FOR PRODUCING AND/OR PROCESSING ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGES, IN PARTICULAR WINE OR SPARKLING WINE, AND USE OF SAID AGENT

Title (en)

AGENT FOR PRODUCING AND/OR PROCESSING ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGES, IN PARTICULAR WINE OR SPARKLING WINE, AND USE OF SAID AGENT

Title (de)

MITTEL ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND/ODER BEHANDLUNG ALKOHOLHALTIGER GETRÄNKE, INSBESONDERE WEIN ODER SCHAUMWEIN, SOWIE DESSEN VERWENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE ET/OU DE TRAITER DES BOISSONS ALCOOLISEES, NOTAMMENT DU VIN OU DU MOUSSEUX, ET SON UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1002048 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98945106 A

Priority

  • DE 19732710 A
  • EP 9804726 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9906527A2] The invention relates to an agent used in the production and/or processing of alcoholic beverages, in particular wine or sparkling wine. This agent is composed of microcapsules which each have an enveloping membrane that encloses the capsule interior completely. The capsule interior contains cells of at least one species of micro-organism, such as yeast or lactic acid bacteria, and/or one or more enzymes. The invention seeks to produce microcapsules having the following characteristics: ability to permanently immobilize the cells or enzymes; presence of enveloping membranes with adjustable transparency and mechanical stability, in accordance with need; liquefiable content of the microcapsules. To this end, the envelope membrane is composed of at least two radially superimposed layers. Each layer encloses all the layers arranged beneath it completely. The invention also relates to the use of this agent in the production of beer and low-molecular alcohols.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12G 1/02; C12C 11/09; C12G 1/073; C12N 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12C 11/09 (2006.01); C12G 1/022 (2006.01); C12G 1/073 (2006.01); C12G 1/10 (2006.01); C12H 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12C 5/004 (2013.01); C12C 11/02 (2013.01); C12C 11/09 (2013.01); C12G 1/0203 (2013.01); C12G 1/064 (2013.01); C12N 11/04 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

  • RILLING R. ET AL: "Immobilization of Enzymes and Living Cells by Multilayer Microcapsules", INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP BIOENCAPSULATION V - FROM FUNDAMENTALS TO INDUSTRIAL APPLICATIONS, 23 September 1996 (1996-09-23) - 25 September 1996 (1996-09-25), POTSDAM, GERMANY, pages 1 - 6, XP002968622
  • POMMERSHEIM R.: "Mehrschichtige Polelektrokomplex-Mikrokapselsysteme zur Immobilisierung von Enzymen und lebenden Zellen", part 3 1994, UNIVERSITAET, MAINZ, article "DIE VERKAPSELUNG", pages: 1 - 32, XP002968623
  • POMMERSHEIM R.: "Mehrschichtige Polelektrokomplex-Mikrokapselsysteme zur Immobilisierung von Enzymen und lebenden Zellen", part 3.7 1994, UNIVERSITAET, MAINZ, article "Physikalische Eigenschaften der Kapsel", pages: 88 - 98, XP002968624
  • POMMERSHEIM R.: "Mehrschichtige Polelektrokomplex-Mikrokapselsysteme zur Immobilisierung von Enzymen und lebenden Zellen", part 5 1994, UNIVERSITAET, MAINZ, article "VERKAPSELUNG VON LEBENDEN ZELLEN", pages: 1 - 24, XP002968625
  • See also references of WO 9906527A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9906527 A2 19990211; WO 9906527 A3 19990422; DE 19834262 A1 19990401; EP 1002048 A2 20000524

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040427

2003-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031015

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991216

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GR IT PT