Global Patent Index - EP 1004954 A1

EP 1004954 A1 2000-05-31 - Optical device for processing digital optical signals

Title (en)

Optical device for processing digital optical signals

Title (de)

Optisches Gerät zur Verarbeitung von digitalen optischen Signalen

Title (fr)

Dispositif optique de traîtement de signaux optiques numériques

Publication

EP 1004954 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98203978 A

Priority

EP 98203978 A

Abstract (en)

An optical device (500) comprising a first element (100) capable of supplying a digital optical signal comprising at least one sequence (1000) of N bits modulated by a suitable phase modulation; a series-parallel converter (6) for converting the said at least one sequence (1000) of N bits into a spatial pattern (3000) of N bits in parallel, carrying the same information as the said sequence (1000) of N bits; and a second element (9) capable of carrying out an operation of comparison between the said spatial pattern (3000) of N bits and a predetermined spatial reference pattern of N bits, and of supplying at the output a signal (2000) having an intensity whose value depends on the result of the said comparison operation, in which the said suitable phase modulation is 0/ alpha pi , in which 0< alpha <1. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06E 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06E 1/00 (2006.01); G06E 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06E 1/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004954 A1 20000531; EP 1004954 B1 20040512; EP 1004954 B9 20041103; DE 69823839 D1 20040617; DE 69823839 T2 20050811

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161125

2017-09-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-07-05 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161128

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161123

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161123

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050215

2005-04-08 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-02-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: CISCO SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL B.V.

2004-12-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: CISCO SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL B.V.

2004-10-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-09-29 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: CISCO SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL B.V.

2004-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69823839 P 20040617

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001123

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI