Global Patent Index - EP 1010220 A1

EP 1010220 A1 2000-06-21 - GLASS FOR HIGH AND FLAT GAIN 1.55 $g(m)m OPTICAL AMPLIFIERS

Title (en)

GLASS FOR HIGH AND FLAT GAIN 1.55 $g(m)m OPTICAL AMPLIFIERS

Title (de)

GLAS MIT HOHEM UND FLACHEM VERSTÄRKUNGSFAKTOR FÜR OPTISCHE VERSTÄRKER BEI 1,55 MIKROMETER

Title (fr)

VERRE POUR AMPLIFICATEURS OPTIQUES 1,55 $g(m)m A GAIN LINEAIRE ELEVE

Publication

EP 1010220 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98943193 A

Priority

  • FR 9711054 A
  • US 9816791 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2768143A1] The invention relates to a family of erbium-doped fluorophosphate glasses for use in optical signal amplification. The composition, based on 100 parts by weight, is constituted by: P2O5 15-40, A12O3 0-5, MgO 0-9, CaO 0-9, SrO 0-9, BaO 0-45, AlF3 5-25, MgF2 0-10, CaF2 0-25, SrF2 0-25, BaF2 0-20, KHF2 0-2, K2TiF6 0-2, with up to 10 parts by weight of erbium oxide. The glasses according to the present invention exhibit a high gain and a very flat spectrum over the 1550 nm bandwidth, as compared to the glasses of the figure. These glass compositions are particularly well suited for use in fiber or planar optical amplification in WDM and similar applications.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01S 3/00; C03C 3/23; C03C 3/247; C03C 4/12; H01S 3/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C03C 3/247 (2006.01); C03C 4/00 (2006.01); C03C 4/12 (2006.01); H01S 3/06 (2006.01); H01S 3/067 (2006.01); H01S 3/17 (2006.01); H01S 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C03C 3/247 (2013.01); C03C 4/0071 (2013.01); C03C 4/12 (2013.01); H01S 3/06708 (2013.01); H01S 3/06716 (2013.01); H01S 3/17 (2013.01); H01S 3/1608 (2013.01); H01S 3/1618 (2013.01); H01S 3/173 (2013.01); H01S 3/175 (2013.01); H01S 2301/04 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

H01S 3/173 + H01S 3/175

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2768143 A1 19990312; FR 2768143 B1 19991203; AU 734647 B2 20010621; AU 9104098 A 19990329; BR 9811411 A 20000822; CA 2297331 A1 19990318; CN 1269915 A 20001011; EP 1010220 A1 20000621; EP 1010220 A4 20010704; JP 2001516958 A 20011002; WO 9913541 A1 19990318

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040302

2001-07-04 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010518

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 03C 3/247 A, 7C 03C 4/00 B, 7H 01S 3/06 B

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000330

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE