Global Patent Index - EP 1010313 A2

EP 1010313 A2 2000-06-21 - METHOD FOR NETWORK CALL HOLD AND PICK-UP

Title (en)

METHOD FOR NETWORK CALL HOLD AND PICK-UP

Title (de)

VERFAHREN FÜR NETZANRUFWARTESTELLUNG UND ANRUFÜBERNAHME

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE MISE EN GARDE ET DE PRISE D'APPEL DANS UN RESEAU

Publication

EP 1010313 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98904989 A

Priority

  • US 9802374 W
  • US 80045997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9836550A2] A method for picking up a call by a second communication device after the call has been placed on hold by a first communication device regardless of the communication device type or whether it is within a closed network is achieved by detecting, by a server associated with the first communication device, that a call has been placed on hold by the first communication device and subsequently suspending the call. Next, the server associated with the first communication device waits for a directive call pick-up message, which may be provided by the first communication device or from a second communication device directly or via a server associated with the second communication device. When the server associated with the first communication device receives the directive pick-up message, it communicates with the server associated with the second communication device. Such a communication establishes a communication link between the servers such that the call may be picked up by the second communication device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04M 3/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 3/428 (2006.01); H04M 3/58 (2006.01); H04M 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 3/42212 (2013.01); H04M 3/428 (2013.01); H04M 3/58 (2013.01); H04M 3/4285 (2013.01); H04M 7/00 (2013.01); H04M 2203/1091 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9836550A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9836550 A2 19980820; WO 9836550 A3 19981022; CA 2286912 A1 19980820; EP 1010313 A2 20000621

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-12 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20020920

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-04-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04M 3/428 A, 7H 04M 3/58 B

2000-09-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NORTEL NETWORKS LIMITED

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990913

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB