Global Patent Index - EP 1012471 A1

EP 1012471 A1 2000-06-28 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (de)

BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1012471 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99906047 A

Priority

  • DE 9900049 W
  • DE 19815781 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19815781A1] The invention relates to a fuel injection valve which is characterized in that it comprises a turbulence disc (30) which is located downstream from a valve seat (15). Said turbulence disc is comprised of at least one metallic material and of at least two turbulence ducts (70) which flow into a turbulence chamber (69). All layers (60, 61, 62) of the turbulence disc are produced by means of electrodeposition (multilayer metallizing). Said layers are directly deposited on top of one another such that they adhere in a fixed manner. The turbulence disc (30) comprises a top layer (60) having a plurality of material areas (60') which are separated from one another by opening structures (65, 66). The turbulence disc (30) lies with the material areas (60') thereof on a valve seat body (9) which comprises the valve seat (15). The fuel injection valve is especially suited for directly injecting fuel into a combustion chamber of a compound compressed, spark injection internal combustion engine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 61/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/1853 (2013.01); F02M 61/162 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9953192A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19815781 A1 19991014; EP 1012471 A1 20000628; EP 1012471 B1 20031008; JP 2002503310 A 20020129; US 6170764 B1 20010109; WO 9953192 A1 19991021

INPADOC legal status


2011-10-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110923

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2005-01-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050114

2004-09-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-09-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040114

2004-08-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-01-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040107

2004-01-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040114

2003-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907278

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-11-13

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-10-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021010

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000425

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT