Global Patent Index - EP 1013450 A3

EP 1013450 A3 2001-02-07 - Fluid system for multiple print heads

Title (en)

Fluid system for multiple print heads

Title (de)

Flüssigkeitssystem für Mehrfachdruckköpfe

Title (fr)

Système hydraulique pour plusieurs têtes d'impression

Publication

EP 1013450 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99309506 A

Priority

US 21166498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1013450A2] A single fluid system (100) simultaneously and independently controls multiple print heads of a continuous ink jet printer. An ink reservoir supplies ink to the multiple print heads and a common vacuum system withdraws ink from the multiple print heads back to the ink reservoir. The system controls the concentration of ink to the multiple print heads and separately supplies ink to the multiple print heads. Multiple print heads are supported independently by this single fluid controller, allowing each print head to operate independently, as if it were controlled by its own fluid system. Hence, each one of the multiple print heads has the capability of cleaning, shutting down, and printing without any interference from the other, while sharing similar components. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/175

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/18 (2006.01); B41J 2/175 (2006.01); B41J 2/185 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013450 A2 20000628; EP 1013450 A3 20010207; EP 1013450 B1 20060719; CA 2292407 A1 20000614; DE 69932395 D1 20060831; DE 69932395 T2 20070719; JP 2000218833 A 20000808

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69932395

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141129

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141129

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141201

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131028

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131025

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070420

2007-02-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69932395 P 20060831

2006-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-07-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040310

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010717

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI