Global patent index - EP 1015838 A1

EP 1015838 A1 2000-07-05 - MOTOR VEHICLE HEAT EXCHANGER AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME

Title (en)

MOTOR VEHICLE HEAT EXCHANGER AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME

Title (de)

WÄRMETAUSCHER FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR POUR VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE, ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1015838 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99957195 A

Priority

  • FR 9901497 W
  • FR 9807923 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2780152A1] The heat exchanger comprises an array of parallel tubes (10) assembled at each end to a top or bottom manifold (12,14). Each manifold has a cover, or series of covers (24,26,28), of identical dimensions to direct flow through groups of the tubes. Additionally, intake and collector covers (16,20) direct flow into and out of the manifolds. The covers are normally made from pressed steel, located and brazed to lips (32,34) on the manifolds.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/053 (2006.01); F28F 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/0209 (2013.01); F28D 1/05375 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9967592A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2780152 A1 19991224; FR 2780152 B1 20010330; DE 69910533 D1 20030925; DE 69910533 T2 20040624; EP 1015838 A1 20000705; EP 1015838 B1 20030820; WO 9967592 A1 19991229

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160616

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160616

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-08-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-02-18 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20030820

2003-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69910533

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2003-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030820

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010323

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000320

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT