Global Patent Index - EP 1017031 A2

EP 1017031 A2 2000-07-05 - Method and apparatus for selling electronic information with or without advertisement

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for selling electronic information with or without advertisement

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verkaufen von elektronischen Informationen mit oder ohne Werbung

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour vendre de l'information électronique avec ou sans publicité

Publication

EP 1017031 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99125799 A

Priority

JP 37201298 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus (1) for selling electronic information required by a user by writing the information to a mechanically readable and writable recording medium (9, 11) includes an operation panel (7) allowing the user to determine which electronic information is to be used and to select whether advertising information is to be included in the electronic information determined by the user, and a CPU (2) for selectively executing an operation of writing the electronic information with advertising information incorporated to recording medium (9, 11) when the user selected to include advertising information, or an operation of writing electronic information only to the recording medium (9, 11) when the user selected not to include the advertising information. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 17/16; G07F 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/00 (2006.01); G06F 17/30 (2006.01); G06Q 30/02 (2012.01); G06Q 30/06 (2012.01); G06Q 50/00 (2012.01); G07F 7/00 (2006.01); G07F 17/16 (2006.01); G10K 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/0014 (2013.01); G07F 17/16 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1017031 A2 20000705; EP 1017031 A3 20020619; CN 1285548 A 20010228; JP 2000194932 A 20000714; JP 3810228 B2 20060816

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20131106

2003-03-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021028

2002-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020820

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-06-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07F 17/16 A, 7G 07F 19/00 B, 7G 06F 17/60 B, 7G 07F 7/10 B, 7G 07F 7/00 B, 7G 06F 1/00 B

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI