Global Patent Index - EP 1017899 A1

EP 1017899 A1 2000-07-12 - TRANSITION-METAL SUBSTITUTED TUNGSTOALUMINATE COMPLEXES FOR DELIGNIFICATION AND WASTE MINERALIZATION

Title (en)

TRANSITION-METAL SUBSTITUTED TUNGSTOALUMINATE COMPLEXES FOR DELIGNIFICATION AND WASTE MINERALIZATION

Title (de)

MIT ÜBERGANGSMETALLEN SUBSTITUIERTE WOLFRAMALUMINAT-KOMPLEXE FÜR DELIGNIFIZIERUNG UND ABFALLMINERALISIERUNG

Title (fr)

COMPLEXES DE TUNGSTOALUMINATE SUBSTITUES PAR DES METAUX DE TRANSITION DESTINES A UNE DELIGNIFICATION ET UNE MINERALISATION DE DECHETS

Publication

EP 1017899 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98944749 A

Priority

  • US 9818462 W
  • US 5800097 P
  • US 14550498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9911857A1] A method of delignifying lignocellulosic fibers is disclosed. In one embodiment, the method comprises the steps of combining a polyoxometalate complex with aluminum heteroatom of the formula [Al1VmMonWoNbpTaq(TM)rOs]<x-> where 1 is 1-6, m is 0-18, n is 0-40, o is 0-40, p is 0-10, q is 0-10, r is 0-9, and TM is a d-electron-containing transition metal ion, where l+m+n+o+p+q >/= 4, and s is sufficiently large that x > 0, with a lignocellulosic pulp, wherein the pH of the combination is between 6 and 11 and the consistency of the combination is 1-20 %; and heating the combination in a temperature-controlled and pressure-controlled vessel under conditions of temperature and time wherein the polyoxometalate is reduced and delignification occurs.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21C 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21C 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21C 9/1063 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FI FR PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9911857 A1 19990311; AU 9221398 A 19990322; BR 9812135 A 20000718; CA 2301719 A1 19990311; EP 1017899 A1 20000712; EP 1017899 A4 20001115; JP 2003514127 A 20030415

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050323

2004-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041112

2000-11-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR PT SE

2000-11-15 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000229

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR PT SE