Global Patent Index - EP 1018854 A1

EP 1018854 A1 2000-07-12 - A method and a device for providing improved speech intelligibility

Title (en)

A method and a device for providing improved speech intelligibility

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verbesserung der Sprachverständlichkeit

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour l' amelioration de l' intelligibilité de la parole

Publication

EP 1018854 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99610002 A

Priority

EP 99610002 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a method for reduction of noise in an audio signal containing noise and a target signal, the method comprising, providing at least two input signals; processing the input signals by means of an independent component analysis, hereby determining statistical dependencies of signal elements of the two input signals and determining whether statistical dependent signal elements form part of the target signal; outputting a part of the audio signal. The invention further relates to a device for use in reducing noise in an audio signal containing noise and a target signal. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 25/00; G10L 21/02; H04R 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/00 (2006.01); G10L 21/0216 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/407 (2013.01); G10L 2021/02165 (2013.01); H04R 25/505 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1018854 A1 20000712; AU 1965200 A 20000724; WO 0041441 A1 20000713

INPADOC legal status


2011-06-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20101214

2010-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20100803

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OTICON A/S

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010112

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI