Global Patent Index - EP 1019515 A1

EP 1019515 A1 2000-07-19 - HOMODIMERS COMPRISING ANGIOSTATIN AND THEIR USE IN ANTI-TUMOUR TREATMENT

Title (en)

HOMODIMERS COMPRISING ANGIOSTATIN AND THEIR USE IN ANTI-TUMOUR TREATMENT

Title (de)

HOMODIMERE AUS ANGIOSTATIN UND DEREN ANWENDUNG IN DER ANTITUMORTHERAPIE

Title (fr)

HOMODIMERS COMPRENANT ANGIOSTATINE ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS UN TRAITEMENT ANTI-TUMEUR

Publication

EP 1019515 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98950775 A

Priority

  • US 9820464 W
  • US 6060997 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9916889A1] The present invention relates to the development of novel multi-functional proteins (MFPs) of the formula: R1-L1-R2, R2-L1-R1, R1-L1-R1, R1-R2, R2-R1, or R1-R1 where R1 is angiostatin, R2 is selected from endostatin, human type I interferon, thrombospondin, interferon-inducible protein 10, platelet factor 4, and L1 is a linker capable of linking R1 to R2. The invention is also drawn to nucleic acids that encode MFPs, procedures for manufacturing MFPs, methods of using MFPs, methods of treating angiogenic-mediated disease with MFPs including methods of treating tumors with MFPs, and treating tumors by gene therapy using vectors that encode MFPs.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/62; A61K 38/17; A61K 38/19; A61K 48/00; C07K 14/52; C07K 14/56; C07K 14/78; C12N 9/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/52 (2006.01); C07K 14/56 (2006.01); C07K 14/78 (2006.01); C12N 9/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/6435 (2013.01); C07K 14/56 (2013.01); C12Y 304/21007 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9916889A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9916889 A1 19990408; AU 9673998 A 19990423; CA 2303401 A1 19990408; EP 1019515 A1 20000719; EP 1705248 A1 20060927; JP 2001518304 A 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-03-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: HOMODIMERS COMPRISING ANGIOSTATIN AND THEIR USE IN ANTI-TUMOUR TREATMENT

2005-04-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: G.D. SEARLE LLC.

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030813

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE