Global Patent Index - EP 1022206 A3

EP 1022206 A3 2001-05-30 - Traction and buffing device for short coupled railway vehicles

Title (en)

Traction and buffing device for short coupled railway vehicles

Title (de)

Zug- und Stosseinrichtung für kurzgekuppelte Schienenfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Dispositif de tamponnement et de traction pour véhicules ferroviaires attelés courts

Publication

EP 1022206 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00101022 A

Priority

DE 19901985 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1022206A2] The traction and impact device includes a support plate (8) fixed firmly to the chassis, directly taking compression forces via the compression surface and also the traction forces. The support plate incorporates a fork head (9) to receive a pivot bolt (5), to which the close coupling head (4) is pivoted. Spring devices (7) may also be incorporated if desired.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61G 9/04; B61G 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61G 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61G 9/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022206 A2 20000726; EP 1022206 A3 20010530; DE 19901985 A1 20000727

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-22 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20030530

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020711

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011115

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 61G 9/04 A, 7B 61G 5/02 B

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI