Global Patent Index - EP 1022821 A1

EP 1022821 A1 2000-07-26 - Apparatus and method for assembling a grommet to a lead

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for assembling a grommet to a lead

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Tüllenbestückung

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour appliquer des manchons

Publication

EP 1022821 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810032 A

Priority

EP 99810032 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves filling a conveyer rail with bung seals (2) from a store and removing one of the bung seals with a centring pin. The pin is pressed onto a spreading part (8) and the bung seal is slid onto the part. The bung seal is fixed by closing a bung seal receiving part (10,11,12). The spreading part and the bung seal receiving part with the cable (13) are moved relative to each other, so that the bung seal is removed from the spreading part. The receiving part is then opened. An Independent claim is included for an apparatus for attaching bung seals to electric cables.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Tüllenbestückung von elektrischen Kabeln wobei eine Tülle (2) aus einer Förderschiene (1) von einem Zentrierdorn (5) aufgenommen und auf ein Aufspreizteil (8) aufgeschoben wird. Anschliessend wird das Aufspreizteil (8) in eine Achsposition verschwenkt (22, 31), die mit der Längsachse des mit einer Tülle (2) zu bestückenden Kabels (13) übereinstimmt, wobei eine erste relative Bewegung zwischen Aufspreizteil (8) und einem Tüllenaufnahmeteil (10, 11, 12) stattfindet. Nach dem Schliessen des Tüllenaufnahmeteils zur Fixierung der Tülle in diesem wird eine zweite relative Bewegung zwischen dem Aufspreizteil (8) und dem Tüllenaufnahmeteil (10, 11, 12) einerseits und dem zu bestückenden Kabel (13) andererseits durchgeführt und schliesslich in einer dritten relativen Bewegung zwischen dem Aufspreizteil (8) einerseits und dem Tüllenaufnahmeteil (10, 11, 12) und dem zu bestückenden Kabel (13) andererseits, die Tülle (2) vom Aufspreizteil (8) abgezogen, so dass nach dem Öffnen des Tüllenaufnahmeteils (10, 11, 12) das bestückte Kabel (13) entnehmbar ist. Dieses Verfahren gestattet eine hohe Taktrate der Bestückung mit einfachen, leichten Bauteilen, so dass die entsprechende Einrichtung eine hohe Betriebssicherheit und wenig Verschleiss aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 43/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022821 A1 20000726; EP 1022821 B1 20040107; DE 59908252 D1 20040212

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170105

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROSENICH PAUL; GISLER CHRISTIAN PATENTBUERO PAUL R

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-01-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050119

2005-01-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-07-07 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040107

2004-04-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040418

2004-03-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040323

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2004-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908252 P 20040212

2004-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-07 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040107

2004-01-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040107

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010405

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001204

2000-10-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PAWO SYSTEMS AG

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI