Global Patent Index - EP 1023936 A1

EP 1023936 A1 2000-08-02 - Magnetic drive agitator and method for adjusting the torque for force transmission of a such agitator

Title (en)

Magnetic drive agitator and method for adjusting the torque for force transmission of a such agitator

Title (de)

Rührwerk mit magnetischem Antrieb und Verfahren zur Drehmomenteinstellung für die Kraftübertragung eines derartigen Rührwerks

Title (fr)

Agitateur à entraînement magnétique et procédé du réglage du couple limite de transmission d'effort d'un tel agitateur

Publication

EP 1023936 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99420233 A

Priority

FR 9901130 A

Abstract (en)

The rotor can be moved in translation parallel to the X-X' axis inside the sleeve between a first position where the two means of coupling are matching to drive the helix in rotation and a second position where they do not interact or interact little, so the helix can be displaced relative to the sleeve without the two couplings interacting The agitator comprises a union (5) which can be mounted in a sealed fashion in a wall (2a) of a receiver with a blind sleeve (10) inside which is fitted a rotor (20) supporting a first magnetic coupling (21). A helix (8) placed around the sleeve is equipped with a second magnetic coupling (17) to drive the helix around an axis (X-X') of rotation. The rotor can be moved in rotation around and parallel to the axis X-X' by a drive shaft (22) which is itself movable in rotation around and parallel to the X-X' axis between two positions corresponding to those of the rotor. The rotor has a central hollow to receive a screw for mounting the rotor on the shaft, with the screw placed along the X-X' axis. The rotor and/or shaft can be immobilized during their parallel movement in an intermediate position. The drive shaft is mounted to slide inside a hollow shaft which is the output from a reduction gear, with the two shafts fixed together in rotation. The hollow shaft has a screw which acts with a fillet fixed to the drive shaft. The parallel movement is controlled by a hydraulic or pneumatic jack. Process of controlling couple transmitted to a magnetic agitator as described above by controlling the position of the rotor along the X-X' axis.

Abstract (fr)

L'agitateur comprend une bride (5) apte à être montée de façon étanche dans une paroi (2a) d'un récipient (1) et pourvue d'un manchon borgne (10) à l'intérieur duquel est logé un rotor (20) supportant un premier moyen (21) de couplage magnétique, alors qu'une hélice (8) disposée autour du manchon (10) est équipée d'un second moyen (17) de couplage magnétique pour son entraînement autour d'un axe de rotation (X-X'). Le rotor (20) est mobile en translation, parallèlement à cet axe (X-X'), à l'intérieur du manchon (10), entre une première position où les premier et second moyens (17, 21) de couplage sont en regard, de telle façon qu'ils coopèrent pour l'entraînement en rotation de l'hélice (8) et une seconde position où ils n'interagissent pas ou peu, de telle façon que l'hélice (8) peut être déplacée par rapport au manchon (10) sans interaction notable des premier et second moyens de couplage (17, 21). Le procédé consiste à régler la position du rotor (20) le long de l'axe (X-X') de telle sorte que les premier et second moyens (17, 21) de couplage magnétique soient plus ou moins en regard. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 13/0827 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1023936 A1 20000802; EP 1023936 B1 20030108; EP 1023936 B2 20070307; AT 230628 T 20030115; CA 2291500 A1 20000728; CA 2291500 C 20080527; DE 69904803 D1 20030213; FR 2788995 A1 20000804; FR 2788995 B1 20010406; US 6206562 B1 20010327

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-08-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160729

2015-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131126

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141016

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MIXEL

- Effective date: 20131130

2013-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20121129

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20121019

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20121112

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-11-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20121022

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031127

2007-03-30 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: MAINTIEN DU BREVET DONT L'ETENDUE A ETE MODIFIEE

2007-03-07 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20070307

2007-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-01-10 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR ADJUSTING THE TORQUE FOR FORCE TRANSMISSION OF A MAGNETIC DRIVE AGITATOR

2003-12-03 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: JB TEC / AGITEC

- Effective date: 20031007

2003-11-26 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031126

2003-08-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1023936E

2003-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-07-09 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030108

2003-04-09 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-04-08 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030408

2003-04-08 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030408

2003-04-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030408

2003-02-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69904803 P 20030213

2003-02-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030108

2003-01-08 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030108

2003-01-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030108

2003-01-08 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030108

2003-01-08 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030108

2003-01-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030108

2003-01-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030108

2003-01-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 230628 T 20030115

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020621

2001-04-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010118

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI