Global patent index - EP 1031393 A1

EP 1031393 A1 2000-08-30 - Preparation of metal foams

Title (en)

Preparation of metal foams

Title (de)

Herstellung von Metallschäumen

Title (fr)

Préparation de mousses métalliques

Publication

EP 1031393 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00102816 A

Priority

DE 19907855 A

Abstract (en)

Metal foam production involves heating a metal powder and blowing agent mixture in a mold to above the metal melting temperature before blowing agent/gas equilibrium is achieved. Metal foam production comprises (a) mixing metal powder, optionally containing metallic or non-metallic lumps (e.g. mineral aggregate), with a gas-evolving blowing agent; (b) preheating the mixture in a mold to below the agent decomposition temperature; (c) heating the mixture to above the melting temperature of the lowest melting metal such that the heating time between the equilibrium decomposition temperature of the agent and the melting temperature of the metal is shorter than the time required for achieving the blowing agent/gas equilibrium state at this temperature; and (d) cooling the resulting metal foam to below the melting point of the lowest melting metal. An Independent claim is also included for a foamed metal semi-finished product obtained by the above process. Preferred Features: The blowing agent is selected from metal hydrides (especially magnesium hydride), carbonates, hydrates and materials which evaporate at the reaction temperature.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist ein Verfahren zur Herstellung von Metallschäumen sowie die auf diesem Wege erhaltenen schaumförmigen Metallkörper. Bei dem Verfahren vermischt man ein oder mehrere Metallpulver, gegebenenfalls beaufschlagt mit mehr oder minder stückigen metallischen oder nichtmetallischen, z. B. mineralischen Zuschlagstoffen, mit einem gasabspaltenden Treibmittel, vorerhitzt das Gemisch in einer offenen oder geschlossenen Form gegebenenfalls auf eine Temperatur unterhalb der Zersetzungstemperatur des Treibmittels, erhitzt das Gemisch anschließend auf eine Temperatur oberhalb der Schmelztemperatur des niedrigschmelzenden Metalls so, daß die Temperaturdifferenz zwischen der Gleichgewichtszersetzungstemperatur des Treibmittels und der Schmelztemperatur des Metalls in einer Zeitspanne überbrückt wird, die kürzer ist als die Zeit, die zur Erreichung des Gleichgewichtszustandes im System Treibmittel//Treibgas bei dieser Temperatur erforderlich ist und kühlt anschließend den erhaltenen Metallschaum auf eine Temperatur unterhalb des Schmelzpunktes des niedrigstschmelzenden Metalls ab.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22F 3/11

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22F 3/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22F 3/1125 (2013.01); B22F 2999/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B22F 2999/00 + B22F 3/1125 + B22F 3/23

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031393 A1 20000830; EP 1031393 B1 20040128; AT 258477 T 20040215; CA 2298348 A1 20000824; CA 2298348 C 20080617; DE 19907855 C1 20000921; NO 20000848 A 20000825; NO 20000848 D0 20000221; US 6444007 B1 20020903

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110211

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2012-01-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50005107

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110211

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110211

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110211

2011-09-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20110901

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100215

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100212

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100218

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100226

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100223

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-03-17 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: SD

- Effective date: 20100223

2010-03-17 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: TD

- Effective date: 20100223

2010-01-01 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2005-11-04 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2005-11-04 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Ref Legal Event Code: CJ

2005-01-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-10-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-04-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-03-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50005107

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-03-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2004-01-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030411

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FR GB IT NL

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000218

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI