Global patent index - EP 1035039 A2

EP 1035039 A2 2000-09-13 - Wrapper for cigarette packs and apparatus for manufacturing the same

Title (en)

Wrapper for cigarette packs and apparatus for manufacturing the same

Title (de)

Gebindepackung für Zigaretten sowie Vorrichtung zum Herstellen derselben

Title (fr)

Emballage pour cartouche de cigarettes ainsi que procédé pour sa fabrication

Publication

EP 1035039 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99121442 A

Priority

US 26682399 A

Abstract (en)

The continuous rectilinear plane of separation between the rows of packets extends in the area of an outer wrapper side wall(18) formed by overlapping and connecting of edge strips(21,23). The weakened line or perforation line(27) in the wrapper side wall extends outside the overlapping(24) formed by the edge strips along the plane of separation. An Independent claim is included for a device for making a perforation line in a material web or blank of foldable packing material such as paper, film or cardboard used to make outer wrappers of cigarette packet bundles A perforation is made by a perforating knife with a number of saw-tooth type points located next to each other and which move over the material.

Abstract (de)

Packungen für eine Gruppe von Zigarettenpackungen, die von einer Außenumhüllung (11) aus Papier, Folie, dünnem Karton oder dergleichen umgeben sind, weisen als Öffnungshilfe eine Perforationslinie (27) im Bereich einer lang gestreckten Seitenwand (18) auf. Die Perforationslinie ist im Bereich einer Teilungsebene zwischen Teilgruppen der Zigarettenpackungen angeordnet, und zwar neben einer aus Randstreifen (21, 23) gebildeten Überlappung (24) der Außenumhüllung (11). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 85/10; B65B 61/02; B65D 75/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 43/00 (2006.01); B65B 19/22 (2006.01); B65B 61/02 (2006.01); B65D 77/00 (2006.01); B65D 85/10 (2006.01); B65D 75/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 85/1072 (2013.01); B65B 19/228 (2013.01); B65B 61/02 (2013.01); B65D 75/5827 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035039 A2 20000913; EP 1035039 A3 20051109; JP 2000264310 A 20000926; JP 4246337 B2 20090402

INPADOC legal status

2007-01-10 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20061102

2006-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060120

2006-07-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2006-01-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20051124

2005-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-11-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-11-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FOCKE & CO. (GMBH & CO. KG)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI