Global Patent Index - EP 1042576 A1

EP 1042576 A1 2000-10-11 - DOOR CLOSER

Title (en)

DOOR CLOSER

Title (de)

TÜRSCHLIESSER

Title (fr)

FERME-PORTE

Publication

EP 1042576 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99924892 A

Priority

  • DE 19834889 A
  • DE 29822258 U
  • EP 9903113 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6421876B1] A door closer with an oblong, one-piece body such to achieve a compact and aesthetic unit which can be produced with a minimum material consumption. The door closer has lateral faces which each have a curvature and/or bevel that shapes towards each other, which curvature or bevel starts at the lower surface and ends at the upper surface of the door closer. The door closer also has bearing blocks that are built between their fronts and the lateral faces ascending from the body's lower surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 3/00; E05F 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 3/00 (2006.01); E05F 3/10 (2006.01); E05F 3/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 3/22 (2013.01); E05F 3/00 (2013.01); E05F 3/10 (2013.01); E05F 3/227 (2013.01); E05F 3/102 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01); Y10T 16/2793 (2013.01); Y10T 16/56 (2013.01); Y10T 16/577 (2013.01); Y10T 16/593 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0008285A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6421876 B1 20020723; AR 023322 A1 20020904; AT 266139 T 20040515; AU 4139599 A 20000228; AU 743753 B2 20020207; BG 104231 A 20000831; BG 63701 B1 20020930; BR 9906645 A 20000801; CA 2305214 A1 20000217; CA 2305214 C 20060627; CN 1114023 C 20030709; CN 1273620 A 20001115; CZ 20001054 A3 20010912; CZ 297506 B6 20070103; DK 1042576 T3 20040913; DK 1042576 T4 20110110; EP 1042576 A1 20001011; EP 1042576 B1 20040506; EP 1042576 B2 20100728; ES 2221386 T3 20041216; ES 2221386 T5 20101210; HK 1032092 A1 20031107; HU 0003821 A2 20010328; HU 0003821 A3 20020228; HU 223620 B1 20041028; JP 2002522671 A 20020723; JP 4523161 B2 20100811; NO 20001068 A 20000302; NO 20001068 D0 20000302; NO 320597 B1 20051227; NZ 503115 A 20010928; PL 190982 B1 20060228; PL 339576 A1 20001218; PT 1042576 E 20040930; RU 2211905 C2 20030910; SK 286172 B6 20080407; SK 4452000 A3 20001211; TR 200000495 T1 20001023; WO 0008285 A1 20000217

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DORMAKABA DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DORMA DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, 58256 ENNEPETAL, DE

- Document: DE 59909399

2017-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59909399

- Representative's name: BALDER IP LAW, S.L., ES

2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150507

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160627

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150506

2016-04-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-03-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: DORMA DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 266139 T

- Effective date: 20160122

2016-02-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150507

2016-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150506

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-02-03 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150506

2016-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150506

2016-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 266139 T

- Effective date: 20150506

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140506

2015-04-29 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20150417

2015-04-21 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: DORMA DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Effective date: 20150415

2015-03-13 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20150206

2015-03-13 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Effective date: 20150206

2015-02-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59909399

2015-02-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59909399

- Representative's name: BALDER IP LAW, S.L., ES

2015-01-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141106

2015-01-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DORMA DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DORMA GMBH + CO. KG, 58256 ENNEPETAL, DE

- Document: DE 59909399

- Effective date: 20141205

2015-01-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DORMAKABA DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DORMA GMBH + CO. KG, 58256 ENNEPETAL, DE

- Document: DE 59909399

- Effective date: 20141205

2015-01-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59909399

- Representative's name: HOEFER & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20141205

2015-01-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59909399

- Effective date: 20141205

2015-01-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59909399

- Representative's name: BALDER IP LAW, S.L., ES

- Effective date: 20141205

2014-12-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59909399

- Representative's name: HOEFER & PARTNER, DE

2014-11-14 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20141106

2014-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140523

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140527

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140520

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140528

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20140513

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140513

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-08-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20130503

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130527

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120506

2013-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-02-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121204

2013-02-27 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2013-02-06 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20100402475

- Effective date: 20121204

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-01-21 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2012-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110512

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20110520

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20110520

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110524

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: DORMA GMBH + CO. KG

- Free text: DORMA GMBH + CO. KG#DORMA PLATZ 1#58256 ENNEPETAL (DE) -TRANSFER TO- DORMA GMBH + CO. KG#DORMA PLATZ 1#58256 ENNEPETAL (DE)

2011-01-10 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

2010-11-26 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Effective date: 20101126

2010-11-18 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20100402475

2010-11-17 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2010-10-19 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2010-09-30 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Free text: DORMA GMBH + CO. KG;DORMA PLATZ 1;58256 ENNEPETAL (DE)

2010-07-30 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2010-07-28 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20100728

2010-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2007-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: GEZE GMBH

2007-01-10 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: GEZE GMBH

- Effective date: 20050204

2005-06-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: GEZE GMBH

2005-04-06 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: GEZE GMBH

- Effective date: 20050204

2005-03-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: GEZE GMBH

- Effective date: 20050204

2005-01-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2221386 T3

2004-10-05 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040402578

2004-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-09-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-08-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040713

2004-07-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2004-07-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-06-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909399 P 20040609

2004-05-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001107

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE