Global Patent Index - EP 1044556 A1

EP 1044556 A1 2000-10-18 - TELEPHONE ANSWERING EQUIPMENT AND METHOD FOR TRANSFERRING INFORMATION TO TELEPHONE EQUIPMENT

Title (en)

TELEPHONE ANSWERING EQUIPMENT AND METHOD FOR TRANSFERRING INFORMATION TO TELEPHONE EQUIPMENT

Title (de)

FERNSPRECHANRUFBEANTWORTER UND VERFAHREN ZUM TRANSFER VON INFORMATIONEN ZU EINEM FERNSPRECHGERÄT

Title (fr)

EQUIPEMENT REPONDEUR TELEPHONIQUE ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE TRANSFERER DES INFORMATIONS A CET EQUIPEMENT TELEPHONIQUE

Publication

EP 1044556 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98962761 A

Priority

  • SE 9802200 W
  • SE 9704768 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9933248A1] The present invention relates to advanced telephone answering equipment, also called a call centre, and to a particular type of message intended to be received by the call centre. The message includes information intended for a receiving person and a machine code intended for the call centre. The message is edited by a sending person, such as to divide the information and the machine code in different blocks. The receiver can cause the call centre to present the information in the message in a desired manner, i.e. in the same way as a caller can be presented with information from a call centre at the present time. The structure in which the message can be presented has, however, been made possible by the sender in the editing or formulating process. The machine code is, for instance, transferred as a DTMF-code.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04M 3/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 3/51 (2006.01); H04M 3/42 (2006.01); H04M 3/50 (2006.01); H04M 3/53 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 3/5307 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9933248A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

WO 9933248 A1 19990701; AU 1792299 A 19990712; CA 2315385 A1 19990701; EP 1044556 A1 20001018; JP 2001527336 A 20011225; SE 511118 C2 19990809; SE 9704768 D0 19971219; SE 9704768 L 19990620

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100121

2007-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040823

2004-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040823

2004-04-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (PUBL)

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000518

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR