Global Patent Index - EP 1048978 A1

EP 1048978 A1 2000-11-02 - Color paper with exceptional reciprocity performance

Title (en)

Color paper with exceptional reciprocity performance

Title (de)

Farbpapier mit aussergewöhnlicher Reziprozitätsleistung

Title (fr)

Papier couleur avec une performance de réciprocité exceptionnelle

Publication

EP 1048978 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00201365 A

Priority

  • US 29954899 A
  • US 32872399 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a negative working reflective base photographic element comprising support material wherein said support material comprises a paper base and overlaying said paper base are full color photographic silver halide containing imaging layers wherein said photographic element has an exposure range of between 1000 nanoseconds and 0.5 seconds when there is a density loss of no more than 10 percent as a function of the red shoulder color record, wherein said photographic element has an exposure range of between 1000 nanoseconds and 0.5 seconds when there is a density loss of no more than 8 percent as a function of the green shoulder color record, wherein said photographic element has an exposure range of between 1000 nanoseconds and 0.5 seconds when there is a density loss of no more than 5 percent as a function of the blue shoulder color record, wherein said photographic element has an exposure range of between 1000 nanoseconds and 0.5 seconds when there is a density loss of no more than 6 percent as a function of the red Dmax color record, wherein said photographic element has an exposure range of between 1000 nanoseconds and 0.5 seconds when there is a density loss of no more than 9 percent as a function of the green Dmax color record, wherein said photographic element has an exposure range of between 1000 nanoseconds and 0.5 seconds when there is a density loss of no more than 5 percent as a function of the blue Dmax color record, wherein said photographic element has an exposure range of between 1000 nanoseconds and 0.5 seconds when there is a density loss of no more than 9 percent as a function of the red inmax color record, wherein said photographic element has an exposure range of between 1000 nanoseconds and 0.5 seconds when there is a density loss of no more than 10 percent as a function of the green inmax color record, and wherein said photographic element has an exposure range of between 1000 nanoseconds and 0.5 seconds when there is a density loss of no more than 5 percent as a function of the blue inmax color record. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 7/30; G03C 1/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 7/20 (2006.01); G03C 1/09 (2006.01); G03C 7/00 (2006.01); G03C 7/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 7/3041 (2013.01); G03C 1/09 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

G03C 1/09 + G03C 1/08 + G03C 2200/42

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048978 A1 20001102; CN 1271869 A 20001101; JP 2000321730 A 20001124

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060717

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

2001-06-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010406

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI